EP2073768 - SELF WARMING MASK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [2009/27] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUNECKER, Laura Folkenberg 6950 Cordery Road Cumming, Georgia 30040 / US | 02 /
ELLEFSON, Kimberly L. 3011 Sawyer Creek Drive Oshkosh, Wisconsin 54904 / US | 03 /
MURPH, Nefetari Bordain 2119 Willow Chase Court Tucker, Georgia 30084 / US | 04 /
MILNER, James Dell 3015 N. Abendroth Street Appleton, Wisconsin 54914 / US | 05 /
SAYRE, Curtis N. 1728 Inverness Avenue Atlanta, Georgia 30306 / US | 06 /
FISH, Jeffrey Eldon 1801 Sunnyside Avenue Winston-salem, North Carolina 27127 / US | 07 /
BRYANT, Kristi J. 3700 N. Whitney Drive Appleton, Wisconsin 54914 / US | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07849168.5 | 16.11.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007IB54681 | Priority number, date | US20060640481 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 640481 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008072124 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2073768 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/03 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
A61F7/03 (EP,KR,US);
A45D44/22 (KR);
A61F7/02 (KR);
A61F7/032 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0062 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTERWÄRMENDE MASKE | [2009/27] | English: | SELF WARMING MASK | [2009/27] | French: | MASQUE AUTO-CHAUFFANT | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.04.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005192653 (TSUNAKAWA SATOSHI [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0020] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025] , [0030] , [0031] , [0034] - [0036] - [0038] , [0051] , [0052] *; | [X]EP1090614 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] , [0030] , [0053] , [0054] , [0058] , [0082] , [0091] , [0097] , [0100] , [0103] , [0113] , [0124] *; | [X]EP1393699 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0018] - [0020] - [0025] , [0036] , [0039] - [0046] *; | [A]US2003056281 (HASEGAWA TOKUICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0014] , [0047] *; | [A]US2005187597 (VANDERSCHUIT CARL R [US]) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0047] , [0069] *; | [A]EP1632202 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0046] * |