EP2120814 - A COLLECTING SYSTEM SUITABLE FOR COLLECTING AND DISPOSING OF BODILY WASTE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RYDER, Gerard Collanmore Tinneranny New Ross CO. Wexford / IE | For all designated states HOUSTON, Anne Collanmore, Tinneranny New Ross, Co. Wexford / IE | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07849537.1 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007IE00125 | Priority number, date | IE20060000949 | 21.12.2006 Original published format: IE 20060949 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008075326 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2120814 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/445 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
A61F5/445 (EP,US);
A61F5/4407 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | SAMMELSYSTEM ZUR SAMMLUNG UND ENTSORGUNG VON SCHLACKENMATERIAL DES KÖRPERS | [2009/48] | English: | A COLLECTING SYSTEM SUITABLE FOR COLLECTING AND DISPOSING OF BODILY WASTE MATERIALS | [2009/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COLLECTE APPROPRIÉ À LA COLLECTE ET À L'ÉVACUATION DE MATÉRIAUX DE DÉCHETS CORPORELS | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 21.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDA]US4387713 (CALANNI JOHN R [US]) [XD] 1-13,15,20-22,26-40,42,57 * abstract * * column 2, lines 3-30 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 53 * [A] 14,16-19,23-25; | [DXAY]DE4418789 (FOR LIFE PRODUKTIONS UND VERTR [DE]) [DX] 57 * abstract * * column 1, lines 31-48 * * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 34 * [A] 2-40 [Y] 1,42; | [A]US6116780 (YOUNG DANIEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-40,42,57 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-8 * * column 2, lines 16-23 ** column 3, lines 40-57 *; | [YA]EP1169984 (SALT & SON LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,42 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0019] , [0023] , [0026] * [A] 2-40,57; | [YA]GB2414677 (WELLAND MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,42 * abstract * [A] 2-40,57 |