EP2088965 - Segmented ring placement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/34] | SEGMENTED RING PLACEMENT | ||
[2012/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valtech Cardio, Ltd. 6 Yoni Netanyahu Street 60376 Or-Yehuda / IL | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Amir 87 Hayarkon Street 63432 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
BEINART, Iftah 8 Yitzhak Ben-Tzvi Street 45373 Hod Hasharon / IL | 03 /
ELIACHAR, Eliahu 25 Yefe Nof Street 34371 Haifa / IL | 04 /
LILACH, Nir . 30063 Kfar Yehoshua / IL | 05 /
GROSSFELD, Ram 4a Eitanim Street 34384 Haifa / IL | 06 /
GOLOM, Dmitry 15/3 Yair Stern Street 35475 Haifa / IL | 07 /
MEYER-BRODNITZ, Gideon 2 Hillel Street 33073 Haifa / IL | 08 /
MOSAIUF, Arnon Geva Carmel 75 POB 153 30855 Geva Carmel / IL | [2012/48] |
Former [2009/34] | 01 /
GROSS, Amir 87 Hayarkon Street 63432 Tel Aviv / IL | ||
02 /
BEINART, Iftah 8 Yitzhak Ben-Tzvi Street 45373 Hod Hasharon / IL | |||
03 /
ELIACHAR, Eliahu 25 Yefe Nof Street 34371 Haifa / IL | |||
04 /
LILACH, Nir . 30063 Kfar Yehoshua / IL | |||
05 /
GROSSFELD, Ram 4a Eitanim Street 34384 Haifa / IL | |||
06 /
GOLOM, Dmitry 15/3 Yair Stern Street 35475 Haifa / IL | |||
07 /
MEYER-BRODNITZ, Gideon 2 Hillel Street 33073 Haifa / IL | |||
08 /
MOSAIUF, Arnon Geva Carmel 75 POB 153 30855 Geva Carmel / IL | Representative(s) | Anderson, James Edward George Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Anderson, James Edward George Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2009/34] | Anderson, James Edward George Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07849540.5 | 05.12.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007IL01503 | Priority number, date | US20060873075P | 05.12.2006 Original published format: US 873075 P | US20070902146P | 16.02.2007 Original published format: US 902146 P | US20070001013 | 29.10.2007 Original published format: US 1013 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008068756 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2088965 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2088965 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
A61F2/2445 (EP,US);
A61B17/064 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61F2/2466 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00783 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0649 (EP,US);
A61F2250/006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | Platzierung eines segmentierten Rings | [2012/18] | English: | Segmented ring placement | [2012/18] | French: | Placement d'anneau segmenté | [2012/18] |
Former [2009/34] | SEGMENTIERTE RINGPLATZIERUNG | ||
Former [2009/34] | SEGMENTED RING PLACEMENT | ||
Former [2009/34] | PLACEMENT D'ANNEAU SEGMENTÉ | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 01.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2007 | AT | 28.11.2012 | BE | 28.11.2012 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | IT | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | LV | 28.11.2012 | MT | 28.11.2012 | NL | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SE | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | IE | 05.12.2012 | LU | 05.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | ES | 11.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 05.12.2007 | |
AT | 28.11.2012 | ||
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
LU | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
LU | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
MT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
BE | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LV | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 28.11.2012 | |
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2006085012 (DOLAN MARK J [US]) [X] 1,9,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,10-12 [I] 10; | [XY]US2005125011 (SPENCE PAUL A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,13-15 * paragraphs [0147] - [0148]; figures 35-36 * [Y] 10-12; | [XYI]US2006241748 (LEE LEONARD Y [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,14,15 * paragraphs [0125] - [0128] - [0134] - [0135] - [0166] - [0170]; figures 12-22,48-51 * [Y] 2-5 [I] 10; | [X]US2005107871 (REALYVASQUEZ FIDEL [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0038] , [0048] - [0051]; figure 8 * | International search | [X]US6569198 (WILSON RICHARD A [US], et al); | [Y]US2004138744 (LASHINSKI RANDALL [US], et al); | [Y]US2001021874 (CARPENTIER ALEXANDRE [FR], et al); | [YP]US2007244556 (RAFIEE NASSER [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005096740 | US2005222678 | US2005288778 | US2005288781 | US2006195134 | US2006282161 | US2006247763 | US2007080188 | US2004148019 | US2004148020 | US2005010287 | US2004138745 | US2006085012 | US2005125011 | US2006241748 | US2005107871 | - O'REILLY S ET AL., "Heart valve surgery pushes the envelope", MEDTECH INSIGHT, (2006), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 73,99 - 108 | - "Percutaneous valve repair: Update on mitral regurgitation and endovascular approaches to the mitral valve", DIETER RS, Applications in Imaging, Cardiac Interventions, AMERSHAM HEALTH, (2003), pages 11 - 14 | - SWAIN CP ET AL., "An endoscopically deliverable tissue-transfixing device for securing biosensors in the gastrointestinal tract", GASTROINTESTINAL ENDOSCOPY, (1994), vol. 40, no. 6, pages 730 - 734, XP009115991 | - ODELL JA ET AL., "Early Results of a Simplified Method of Mitral Valve Annuloplasty", CIRCULATION, (1995), vol. 92, pages 150 - 154 | US20060873075 | US20070902146 |