EP2119792 - NOVEL MACROLIDE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Hokkaido University 8, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 060-0808 / JP | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUDA, Masashi c/o National University Corporation Hokkaido University, Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kita 12-jyo Nishi 6-chome, Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 0600812 / JP | 02 /
OGUCHI, Keiko c/o National University Corporation Hokkaido University, Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kita 12-jyo Nishi 6-chome, Kita-ku Spporo-shi, Hokkaido 0600812 / JP | 03 /
IWAMOTO, Rie c/o National University Corporation Hokkaido University, Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kita 12-jyo Nishi 6-chome, Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 0600812 / JP | 04 /
OKAMOTO, Yumiko c/o National University Corporation Hokkaido University, Graduate School of Pharmaceutical Sciences Kita 12-jyo Nishi 6-chome, Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 0600812 / JP | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07849855.7 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007JP01425 | Priority number, date | JP20060351043 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006351043 | [2009/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008081568 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2119792 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12P17/18, A61K31/335, A61K31/336, A61K31/34, A61K31/35, A61P35/00, C07D315/00, C07D493/08, C07D493/18, C12N1/12, C12P17/08 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
C12P17/08 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D313/00 (EP,US);
C07D315/00 (EP,US);
C07D493/04 (EP,US);
C07D493/08 (EP,US);
C07D493/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | NEUE MAKROLID-VERBINDUNG | [2009/47] | English: | NOVEL MACROLIDE COMPOUND | [2009/47] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE MACROLIDE INNOVANT | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2009 | Translation filed | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 01.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 20.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/44] | Divisional application(s) | EP11164115.5 / EP2357249 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - K. OGUCHI ET AL., "Amphidinolides B6 and B7, Cytotoxic Macrolides from a Symbiotic Dinoflagellate Amphidinium Species", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, (2007), vol. 70, no. 10, pages 1676 - 1679, XP002575700 [XP] 1-3,5 * page 1676, left-hand column; page 1677, figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np0703085 | [XP] - M. TSUDA ET AL., "Iriomoteolide-1a, a Potent Cytotoxic 20-Membered Macrolide from a Benthic Dinoflagellate Amphidinium Species", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 72, no. 12, pages 4469 - 4474, XP002575701 [XP] 1-2,4,6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo070414b | [A] - JUN'ICHI KOBAYASHI ET AL., "Amphidinolide-A, a novel antineoplastic macrolide from the marine dinoflagellate Amphidinium sp.", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1986), vol. 27, no. 47, pages 5755 - 5758, XP002575702 [A] 1-2 * page 5755 * * page 5756, formula 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)85318-6 | [A] - KOBAYASHI JUN-ICHI ET AL, "Amphidinolides T2, T3, and T4, new 19-membered macrolides from the dinoflagellate Amphidinium sp. and the biosynthesis of amphidinolide T1", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON.; US, (20010101), vol. 66, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 134 - 142, XP002311048 [A] 1-2 * page 134, abstract and paragraph "Introduction"; page 135, chart 1; page 136, figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo005607c | International search | [A] - TSUDA M. ET AL, "Amphidinolide U, novel 20-membered macrolide from marine dinoflagellate Amphidinium sp", TETRAHEDRON, (1999), vol. 55, no. 51, pages 14565 - 14570, XP004185326 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(99)00932-1 | [XP] - TSUDA M. ET AL., "Iriomoteolides-1b and -1c, 20-membered macrolides from a marine dinoflagellate AMphidinium species", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, (2007), vol. 70, no. 10, pages 1661 - 1663, XP008109992 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np0702537 | by applicant | - J.KOBAYASHI, TETERAHEDRON LETT., (1986), vol. 27, page 5755 |