EP2107676 - CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR POWER CONVERSION SYSTEM HAVING INSTANTANEOUS VOLTAGE DROP - SERVICE INTERRUPTION COUNTER-MEASURE FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meidensha Corporation 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | For all designated states The Tokyo Electric Power Company, Incorporated 1-3, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8560 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Meidensha Corporation 1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | ||
For all designated states The Tokyo Electric Power Co., Inc. 1-3, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8560 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMOMURA, Junichi c/o MEIDENSHA CORPORATION, 1-1, Osaki 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 02 /
OHISHI, Satoru c/o MEIDENSHA CORPORATION, 1-1, Osaki 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Kenichi c/o The Tokyo Electric Power Company, Inc., 1-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8560 / JP | [2009/41] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07850364.6 | 10.12.2007 | [2009/41] | WO2007JP73796 | Priority number, date | JP20070004082 | 12.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007004082 | [2009/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008084617 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2107676 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/06, // H03K17/16 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H02J9/062 (EP,US);
H02J9/06 (KR);
H02M7/48 (KR);
H03K17/161 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/41] | H02M7/48, H02J9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR ENERGIEUMWANDLUNGSSYSTEM MIT SOFORTIGEN GEGENMASSNAHMEN BEI SPANNUNGSABFALL UND BETRIEBSUNTERBRECHUNG | [2009/41] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR POWER CONVERSION SYSTEM HAVING INSTANTANEOUS VOLTAGE DROP - SERVICE INTERRUPTION COUNTER-MEASURE FUNCTIONS | [2009/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE CONVERSION DE PUISSANCE AYANT DES FONCTIONS DE CONTRE-MESURE EN CAS DE CHUTE DE TENSION INSTANTANÉE ET D'INTERRUPTION DE SERVICE | [2009/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2009 | Translation filed | 29.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 12.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 05.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9312570 (BEST POWER TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-4 * page 4, line 4 - line 5 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 33; figure 2 *; | [I]US2006014054 (SUGAWARA YOSHITAKA [JP]) [I] 1-4 * page 10, paragraph 89 - paragraph 90; figure 7 *; | [A] - HUNG J-C ET AL, "An active-clamp push-pull converter for battery sourcing applications", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 2005. APEC 2005. TWENTIETH ANNUAL IEEE AUSTIN, TX, USA 6-10 MARCH 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20050306), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/APEC.2005.1453151, ISBN 978-0-7803-8975-5, page 1186, XP010809446 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2005.1453151 | International search | [A]JP2006509489 ; | [A]JP2005287125 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2007215378 (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD) |