EP2095189 - COMPOSITION FOR FORMING RESIST FOUNDATION FILM CONTAINING LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT DISSOLUTION ACCELERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Masakazu Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi Toyama-shi Toyama 939-2753 / JP | 02 /
HAMADA, Takahiro Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi Toyama-shi Toyama 939-2753 / JP | 03 /
ENOMOTO, Tomoyuki Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi Toyama-shi Toyama 939-2753 / JP | [2013/28] |
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
KATO, Masakazu Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi Toyama-shi Toyama 939-2753 / JP | ||
02 /
HAMADA, Takahiro Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi Toyama-shi Toyama 939-2753 / JP | |||
03 /
ENOMOTO, Tomoyuki Nissan Chemical Industries Ltd. Electronic Materials Research Laboratories 635 Sasakura Fuchu-machi Toyama-shi Toyama 939-2753 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07850422.2 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007JP73860 | Priority number, date | JP20060335723 | 13.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006335723 | [2009/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008072624 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2095189 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2095189 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/11, G03F7/095, H01L21/027 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
G03F7/091 (EP,US);
G03F7/095 (KR);
G03F7/039 (US);
G03F7/0392 (US);
G03F7/11 (KR);
G03F7/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | EINEN AUFLÖSUNGSBESCHLEUNIGER MIT NIEDRIGEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BILDUNG EINES RESISTGRUNDFILMS | [2009/36] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR FORMING RESIST FOUNDATION FILM CONTAINING LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT DISSOLUTION ACCELERATOR | [2009/36] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR FORMER UN FILM DE FONDATION DE RÉSIST CONTENANT UN ACCÉLÉRATEUR DE DISSOLUTION DE FAIBLE MASSE MOLÉCULAIRE | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2009 | Translation filed | 26.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 30.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2007 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | MT | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | ES | 21.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | GB | 11.12.2013 | IE | 11.12.2013 | LU | 11.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 11.12.2007 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
GB | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
GB | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
GB | 11.12.2013 | ||
IE | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
IE | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO2005111724 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2005070154 (TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO LTD) | by applicant | US6156479 | JP2004054286 | JP2005070154 | WO2005093513 | WO2005111719 | WO2005111724 |