EP2227032 - BRIGHTNESS INFORMATION DISPLAY AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leader Electronics Corp. 6-33, Tsunashima Higashi 2-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8505 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Leader Electronics Corp. 6-33, Tsunashima Higashi 2-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8505 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANO, Koji c/o Leader Electronics Corp. 6-33, Tsunashima Higashi 2-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8505 / JP | 02 /
IMAMURA, Genichi c/o Leader Electronics Corp. 6-33, Tsunashima Higashi 2-chome Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8505 / JP | [2019/25] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
YANO, Koji c/o Leadrer Electronics Corp. of 6-33, Tsunashima Higashi 2-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8505 / JP | ||
02 /
IMAMURA, Genichi c/o Leadrer Electronics Corp. of 6-33, Tsunashima Higashi 2-chome, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8505 / JP | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2019/25] |
Former [2010/36] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07850435.4 | 11.12.2007 | [2010/36] | WO2007JP73873 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009075027 | Date: | 18.06.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2227032 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2227032 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.06.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/00 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
H04N9/77 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (KR);
G01J1/02 (EP,US);
G01J1/0219 (EP,US);
G01J1/4228 (EP,US);
H04N17/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/25] |
Former [2010/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HELLIGKEITSINFORMATIONSANZEIGE UND VERFAHREN | [2010/36] | English: | BRIGHTNESS INFORMATION DISPLAY AND METHOD | [2010/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS DE LUMINOSITÉ | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2008 | Translation filed | 07.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2008 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 06.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2007 | AT | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | ES | 19.06.2019 | FI | 19.06.2019 | IT | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | PL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | SE | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | IE | 11.12.2019 | LU | 11.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 11.12.2007 | |
AT | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0240971 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0008]; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH06351048 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH06351048 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2003333629 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP, et al) | Examination | US3770884 |