EP2116444 - VEHICLE STEERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Shingo c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
NAKA, Masami c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
HAYAMA, Ryouhei c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 04 /
HIGASHI, Kenji c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2012/15] |
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
MAEDA, Shingo c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKA, Masami c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
HAYAMA, Ryouhei c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
04 /
HIGASHI, Kenji c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07850991.6 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/46] | WO2007JP74566 | Priority number, date | JP20060356514 | 28.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006356514 | [2009/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008084649 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116444 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116444 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00, B62D5/04, B62D5/30, B62D101/00, B62D113/00, B62D119/00 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
B62D5/003 (EP,US);
B62D5/001 (EP,US);
B62D5/006 (EP,US);
B62D5/0463 (EP,US);
B62D6/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLENKVORRICHTUNG | [2009/46] | English: | VEHICLE STEERING DEVICE | [2009/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION DE VÉHICULE | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2009 | Translation filed | 10.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 21.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2007 | AT | 11.04.2012 | BE | 11.04.2012 | CY | 11.04.2012 | CZ | 11.04.2012 | DK | 11.04.2012 | EE | 11.04.2012 | FI | 11.04.2012 | IT | 11.04.2012 | LT | 11.04.2012 | LV | 11.04.2012 | MT | 11.04.2012 | NL | 11.04.2012 | PL | 11.04.2012 | RO | 11.04.2012 | SE | 11.04.2012 | SI | 11.04.2012 | SK | 11.04.2012 | TR | 11.04.2012 | BG | 11.07.2012 | GR | 12.07.2012 | ES | 22.07.2012 | IS | 11.08.2012 | PT | 13.08.2012 | GB | 20.12.2012 | IE | 20.12.2012 | LU | 20.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
GB | 20.12.2012 | ||
IE | 20.12.2012 | ||
LU | 20.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
TR | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
GB | 20.12.2012 | ||
IE | 20.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
MT | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
GB | 20.12.2012 | ||
IE | 20.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
IE | 20.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
BG | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
ES | 22.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
IT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
RO | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
SK | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
EE | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
DK | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
NL | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.04.2012 | |
BE | 11.04.2012 | ||
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 11.04.2012 | |
CY | 11.04.2012 | ||
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
PT | 13.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
SI | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
LV | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.04.2012 | |
FI | 11.04.2012 | ||
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
PL | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 11.04.2012 | |
LT | 11.04.2012 | ||
SE | 11.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 11.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1698539 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0117] ** figure - * | International search | [A]JP2002225733 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [A]JP2004034751 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [Y]JP2004075051 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC); | [Y]JP2004090782 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [X]JP2006256453 (NISSAN MOTOR) | by applicant | JP2006356514 | JP2002225733 |