EP2233749 - PRESSURIZING CENTRIFUGAL PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YONEHARA GIKEN CO., LTD. 1339 Kitaaraki Taisha-cho Izumo-shi Shimane 699-0722 / JP | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONEHARA, Ryoichi c/o YONEHARA GIKEN CO. LTD. 1339 Oaza-Kitaaraki Taisha-cho Hikawa-gun Shimane 699-0722 / JP | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07851048.4 | 21.12.2007 | [2010/39] | WO2007JP74642 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009081465 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233749 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/24, F04D5/00, F04D7/04, F04D29/42, F04D29/66, F04D31/00, F04D23/00, F04D29/18 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
F04D29/2288 (EP,US);
F04D23/008 (EP,US);
F04D29/188 (EP,US);
F04D29/2272 (EP,US);
F04D29/2294 (EP,US);
F04D29/242 (EP,US);
F04D5/002 (EP,US);
F04D5/008 (EP,US);
F04D7/04 (EP,US);
F05D2250/51 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | F04D29/24, F04D5/00, F04D7/04, F04D29/42, F04D29/66, F04D31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALDRUCKPUMPE | [2010/39] | English: | PRESSURIZING CENTRIFUGAL PUMP | [2010/39] | French: | POMPE CENTRIFUGE À PRESSION | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2010 | Translation filed | 07.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 15.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1402713 (LINTOTT ENG LTD) [Y] 1-5 * page 1, lines 11-39 * * page 2, lines 40-68 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US3915589 (VANDER LINDEN DALE B) [A] 1,3,4 * figures 7,10,12,13,15-17 * * column 5, lines 1-9 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 9 *; | [Y]EP0477650 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6224323 (MURASE SEIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * figures 5,8 * * column 2, lines 32-38 * * column 6, lines 23-43 *; | [A]JP2005240628 (TSURUMI MFG) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]EP1739310 (YONEHARA GIKEN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * figures 2-11; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]JPS63138199 (NIKKO ENG); | [Y]JPH04159493 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH09177693 (ASMO CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000240584 (EBARA CORP); | [Y]JP2005240628 (TSURUMI MFG); | [A]JP2005240629 (TSURUMI MFG); | [Y]JP2005270245 (HITACHI HOME & LIFE SOLUTIONS); | [Y]WO2005098239 (YONEHARA GIKEN CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2006307859 (SULZER PUMPEN AG) | by applicant | JP2004060470 |