EP2084972 - MEAT SUBSTITUTE FOOD PRODUCT AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigma Alimentos, S.A. De C.V. Ave. Gómez Morín 1111 Co. Carrizalejo, C.P. 66254 San Pedro Garza García Nuevo León / MX | [2016/02] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Sigma Alimentos, S.A. De C.V. Ave. Gomez Morin 1111 Co. Carrizalejo, C.P. 66254 San Pedro Garza Garcia Neuvo Leon / MX | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESPELETA VEGA, Alicia Río Nazas 117, Col. México C.P. 64740 Monterrey, Nuevo León / MX | 02 /
MORA CASTILLO, César, Dalmacio Cto. Hacienda de los Lirios 1-A Col. Hacienda Real de Tultepec C.P. 54987 Tultepec, Estado de México / MX | [2016/02] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
ESPELETA VEGA, Alicia Río Nazas 117, Col. México C.P. 64740 Monterrey, Nuevo León / MX | ||
02 /
MORA CASTILLO, César, Dalmacio Cto. Hacienda de los Lirios 1-A Col. Hacienda Real de Tultepec C.P. 54987 Tultepec, Estado de México / MX | Representative(s) | Molina Garcia, Julia Moratin, 11 46002 Valencia / ES | [2016/02] |
Former [2009/32] | Molina Garcia, Julia Moratin, 11 46002 Valencia / ES | Application number, filing date | 07851833.9 | 01.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007MX00133 | Priority number, date | MX2006NL00083 | 01.11.2006 Original published format: MX NL06000083 | [2009/32] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008054189 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | ES | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084972 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2084972 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/14, A23J3/22, A23L1/314 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
A23J3/227 (EP,BR,US);
A23L13/40 (KR);
A23J3/14 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A23J3/22 (KR);
A23L13/426 (EP,BR,US);
A23L13/62 (EP,BR,US);
A23L13/67 (EP,BR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLEISCHERSATZPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2009/32] | English: | MEAT SUBSTITUTE FOOD PRODUCT AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2009/32] | French: | PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE DE SUBSTITUTION DE VIANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2009 | Translation filed | 26.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 18.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2007 | AT | 13.01.2016 | BE | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.11.2007 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]MXPA05004544 (SIGMA ALIMENTOS SA DE CV [MX]) [Y] 1-11,13,14,20,22-31 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2006073261 (MCMINDES MATTHEW K [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,13,14,20,22-31 * paragraphs: [0001], [0002], [0028], [0038]-[0044], [0087]-[0090], [0092], [0123], [0128]-[0132];; claims 1, 9 *; | [A]US3646880 (NORRIS JAMES D) [A] 1-31 * column 1, lines 1-37 - column 2, lines 60-75 * * column 3, lines 1-3 - column 6, lines 50-64 * * figures 1, 3, 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US5044264 (FORNEY ROBERT B [US]) [A] 1-31 * column 1, lines 1-45 - column 2, lines 1-18 * * column 3, lines 20-44 - column 5, lines 14-25; figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [A]US3911157 (BATES NORMAN ANDREW, et al) [A] 1-31 * column 1, lines 1-9, 54-61 - column 2, lines 21-27 * * column 3, lines 3-11, 27-33 - column 4, lines 11-31 * * column 5, lines 8-23, 56-67; examples 1-2; claims 1, 4 *; | [A]EP1493337 (SOLAE LLC [US]) [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | International search | [X]MXPA05004544 (SIGMA ALIMENTOS SA DE CV [MX]); | [X]WO2006041966 (SOLAE LLC [US], et al); | [A]EP1714595 (ELECTROLUX PROFESSIONAL SPA [IT]); | [A]ES8703246 (IND NAVARRA DE ENVOLTURAS CELU [ES]) | by applicant | US4057656 | MX165467 | ES2102974 | MXA04006552 | US2006035003 | US2006035005 |