EP2100274 - SYSTEMS FOR HYBRID GEOMETRIC/VOLUMETRIC REPRESENTATION OF 3D OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D Systems, Inc. 333 Three D Systems Circle Rock Hill, SC 29730 / US | [2013/43] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Sensable Technologies, Inc. 15 Constitution Way Woburn, MA 01801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAKEN, Daniel 190 North Shore Road, 318 Revere, MA 02151 / US | 02 /
COOK, Craig 34 Campbell Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 03 /
AMIDON, Brad 5 Pamela Drive Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 04 /
ITKOWITZ, Brandon 32 Wellesley Road Natick, MA 01760 / US | 05 /
DAVIDSON, Scott 66 Spring Park Avenue Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US | 06 /
HAMMER, Vincent M. 32 Ethan Allen Highway Milton, VT 05468 / US | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/21] |
Former [2013/43] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/38] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07853197.7 | 30.11.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007US24648 | Priority number, date | US20060872542P | 30.11.2006 Original published format: US 872542 P | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008066907 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100274 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2100274 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/30, G06T17/20, G06F3/033 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G06F3/0338 (EP,US);
G06T19/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/38] | G06T17/00, G06T17/40, G06F3/033 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/21] |
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR HYBRIDEN GEOMETRISCHEN/VOLUMETRISCHEN DARSTELLUNG VON 3D-OBJEKTEN | [2009/38] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR HYBRID GEOMETRIC/VOLUMETRIC REPRESENTATION OF 3D OBJECTS | [2009/38] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE REPRÉSENTATION GÉOMÉTRIQUE/VOLUMÉTRIQUE HYBRIDE D'OBJETS EN 3D | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 21.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2018 | 12.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2007 | AT | 22.05.2019 | CY | 22.05.2019 | CZ | 22.05.2019 | DK | 22.05.2019 | EE | 22.05.2019 | ES | 22.05.2019 | FI | 22.05.2019 | LT | 22.05.2019 | LV | 22.05.2019 | MC | 22.05.2019 | MT | 22.05.2019 | NL | 22.05.2019 | PL | 22.05.2019 | RO | 22.05.2019 | SE | 22.05.2019 | SI | 22.05.2019 | SK | 22.05.2019 | TR | 22.05.2019 | BG | 22.08.2019 | GR | 23.08.2019 | IS | 22.09.2019 | PT | 22.09.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | IE | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | LU | 30.11.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.11.2007 | |
AT | 22.05.2019 | ||
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
IE | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
LU | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
IS | 22.09.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
IE | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
LU | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CY | 22.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
IE | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
LU | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
IE | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
LU | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
IE | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
LU | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
MC | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
LU | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
LU | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
PL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SI | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
TR | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
EE | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
SK | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 22.05.2019 | |
CZ | 22.05.2019 | ||
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
RO | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 22.05.2019 | |
DK | 22.05.2019 | ||
ES | 22.05.2019 | ||
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
LV | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
BG | 22.08.2019 | ||
GR | 23.08.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
NL | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | ||
SE | 22.05.2019 | ||
PT | 22.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 22.05.2019 | |
FI | 22.05.2019 | ||
LT | 22.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1241630 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0049] , [0053] , [0061] - [0063] - [0097] - [0103] - [0120] , [0121]; figures 1,2,4,10,14 * * column 13, paragraph 5FF * [A] 2-4,13-15; | [X] - KIM, SUKHATME, DESBRUN, "A Haptic-Rendering Technique Based on Hybrid Surface Representation", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, (200403), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 66 - 75, XP002473919 [X] 1-22 * page 66, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 67, column LEFT * * page 70, column LEFT - column RIGHT * * page 71, column LEFT * * page 72, column RIGHT * * figures 2,7,9-11,13 * | [X] - HUA, QIN, "Haptics-Based Dynamic Implicit Solid Modeling", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VISUALIZATION AND COMPUTER GRAPHICS, (200409), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 574 - 586, XP002473920 [X] 1-22 * sections 3.2, 4, 5.1, 6.2 *; page 583, column RIGHT * * figures 2-5,12,15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVCG.2004.28 | [A] - SENSABLE TECHNOLOGIES, "PROGRAMMERS GUIDE", OPENHAPTICS TOOLKIT, V2.0, (20050824), pages 6-1 - 6-38, XP002473921 [A] 1-22 * pages 6-4-6-8, - pages 6-12 * | Examination | US6084587 | - Hui Chen ET AL, "Haptic-dependent navigation & interaction of hybrid virtual models", Virtual Reality Continuum And Its Applications Proceedings of the 2004 ACM SIGGRAPH international conference on Virtual Reality continuum and its applications in industry, US, (20040101), doi:10.1145/1044588.1044665, ISBN 978-1-58113-884-9, page 355, XP055478108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1044588.1044665 | by applicant | EP1241630 | - KIM, SUKHATME, DESBURN, "A Haptic-Rendering Technique Based on Hybrid Representation", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATION, vol. 3-4, page 200 | - HUA, QIN, "Haptics - Based Dynamic Implicit Solid Modeling", IEEE TRANS. ON VISUALIZATION AND COMPUTER GRAPHICS, (2004), vol. 9-10 |