EP2089034 - NOVEL USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 430 East 29th Street, Suite 900 New York, NY 10016 / US | [2016/33] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Intra-Cellular Therapies, Inc. 3960 Broadway New York, NY 10032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIENBERG, Allen A. 3960 Broadway New York, NY 10032 / US | 02 /
WENNOGLE, Lawrence P. 3960 Broadway New York, NY 10032 / US | 03 /
MATES, Sharon 3960 Broadway New York, NY 10032 / US | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | ||
Former [2009/34] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07853247.0 | 05.12.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007US24866 | Priority number, date | US20060873104P | 05.12.2006 Original published format: US 873104 P | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008070095 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089034 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/495, A61K31/519, A61K31/565, A61K31/57, A61K9/00 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | A61K31/495, A61K31/519, A61K31/565, A61K31/57, A61K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/34] | A61K31/495 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | NEUE VERWENDUNGSZWECKE | [2009/34] | English: | NOVEL USES | [2009/34] | French: | NOUVELLES UTILISATIONS | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 20.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0201188 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [Y] 1,12,13,16-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9119717 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [Y] 1,8,12,13,16-18,20 * page 1, line 18 - page 3, line 21 * * page 75, lines 1-10 * * claims 1-9; compounds 1-56 *; | [XYI]US2004259792 (PALMER STEPHEN S [US], et al) [X] 1,8,12,13,16 * paragraph [0118] * * paragraphs [0173] - [0176]; claims 14,16,17,18,19,26-29,32 * [Y] 2-7,17,18 [I] 19,20; | [XP]WO2006133261 (INTRA CELLULAR THERAPIES INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-13,16-20 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2007143705 (INTRA CELLULAR THERAPIES INC [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2008063505 (INTRA CELLULAR THERAPIES INC [US], et al) [E] 1-20* the whole document *; | [Y] - JIANG ET AL, "Chemoenzymatic Asymmetric Total Synthesis of Phosphodiesterase Inhibitors: Preparation of a Polycyclic Pyrazolo[3,4-d]pyrimidine from an Acylnitroso Diels-Alder Cycloadduct-Derived Aminocyclopentenol", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY , 70(7), 2824-2827 CODEN: JOCEAH; ISSN: 0022-3263,, (20050101), XP002578513 [Y] 1,2,4-13,16-20 * Figure 1, Scheme 6 * | [Y] - YAN XIA ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND EVALUATION OF POLYCYCLIC PYRAZOLOÄ3,4-DÜPYRIMIDINES AS PDE1 AND PDE5 CGMP PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JM970495B, (19970101), vol. 40, no. 26, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4372 - 4377, XP002166300 [Y] 1,2,4-13,16-20 * table 1 * * Chart 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970495b | [Y] - UECKERT STEFAN ET AL, "Detection of phosphodiesterase (PDE) isoenzymes 1, 2, 10 and 11 in the human clitoris by means of molecular biology and immunohistochemistry", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20040401), vol. 171, no. 4, Suppl, ISSN 0022-5347, page 428, XP009133665 [Y] 1-13,16-20 * abstract * | [A] - ALLENDE C ET AL, "Characterization of cyclic nucleotide phosphodiesterases in Xenopus laevis ovary", COMPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY. B. COMPARATIVEBIOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0305-0491(87)90348-8, vol. 88, no. 2, ISSN 0305-0491, (19870101), pages 581 - 587, (19870101), XP023529029 [A] 1-20 * page 586, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0305-0491(87)90348-8 | International search | [Y]US5294612 (BACON EDWARD R [US], et al); | [Y]US5939419 (TULSHIAN DEEN [US], et al); | [X]US6235742 (BELL ANDREW SIMON [GB], et al); | [Y]US6756373 (ALLERTON CHARLOTTE MOIRA NORFO [GB], et al); | [Y]US6969719 (ASBEROM THEODROS [US], et al) | Examination | - AHN H-S ET AL, "POTENT TETRACYCLIC GUANINE INHIBITORS OF PDE1 AND PDE5 CYCLIC GUANOSINE MONOPHOSPHATE PHOSPHODIESTERASES WITH ORAL ANTIHYPERTENSIVE ACTIVITY", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19970101), vol. 40, no. 14, doi:10.1021/JM9608467, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2196 - 2210, XP001120374 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9608467 | by applicant | EP0201188 | US4666908 | EP0538332 | US5393755 | EP0911333 | US5939419 | US6235742 | WO03020702 | WO03042216 | US6943171 | US6969719 | WO2006US22066 | WO2006US33179 |