EP2087052 - STABLE OFFSET EMULSION INKS CONTAINING WATER TOLERANT EMULSION STABILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Chemical Corporation 35 Waterview Blvd. Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARUI, Nobuo 12 Yawata-kaigandori Ichihara 209-8585 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Hideo 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Denness, James Edward, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Denness, James Edward, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07854068.9 | 15.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US81422 | Priority number, date | US20060853329P | 03.11.2006 Original published format: US 853329 P | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008057722 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2087052 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2087052 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
C09D11/0235 (EP,US);
C09D11/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | STABILE OFFSET-EMULSIONSFARBEN MIT WASSERVERTRÄGLICHEM EMULSIONSSTABILISATOR | [2009/33] | English: | STABLE OFFSET EMULSION INKS CONTAINING WATER TOLERANT EMULSION STABILIZER | [2009/33] | French: | ENCRES OFFSET ÉMULSIONNÉES ET STABLES CONTENANT UN STABILISANT D'ÉMULSION TOLÉRANT L'EAU | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 30.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2007 | AT | 06.08.2014 | BE | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | IT | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | LV | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | MT | 06.08.2014 | NL | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | TR | 06.08.2014 | IE | 15.10.2014 | LU | 15.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.10.2007 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
LU | 15.10.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5800599 (ASADA KEISUKE [JP]) [X] 1-17 * example - *; | [X]US6149720 (ASADA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 6, line 46; examples 10,11 *; | [X]GB2408050 (GR ADVANCED MATERIALS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-17 * page 7; example 1; claim 7 *; | [E]WO2008048590 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US], et al) [E] 1* example -; claim - * | International search | [Y]US2002107309 (MALANGA JOSEPH [US], et al); | [Y]US2004040468 (NOMURA MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2004194658 (KONNO YUKAKO [JP], et al) |