EP2081647 - METHOD OF PREVENTING OR TREATING METABOLIC SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states United States Department Of Agriculture 800 Buchanan Street Albany, CA 94710-1105 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | ||
For all designated states United States Department Of Agriculture 800 Buchanan Street Albany, CA 94710-1105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYNCH, Stephanie K. 11 Twin Hill Drive Boonton Twp., NJ 07005 / US | 02 /
TUROWSKI, Maciej 1705 Bauss Court Midland, MI 48642 / US | 03 /
YOKOYAMA, Wallace H. 642 Arlington Avenue Berkeley, CA 94707 / US | 04 /
CONKLIN, Jerry R. 2686 East Shaffer Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2010/04] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
LYNCH, Stephanie K. 78 Rue de la Federation 75015 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
TUROWSKI, Maciej 1705 Bauss Court Midland, MI 48642 / US | |||
03 /
YOKOYAMA, Wallace H. 642 Arlington Avenue Berkeley, CA 94707 / US | |||
04 /
CONKLIN, Jerry R. 2686 East Shaffer Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | Representative(s) | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07854169.5 | 18.10.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007US81785 | Priority number, date | US20060853389P | 20.10.2006 Original published format: US 853389 P | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008051793 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2081647 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61P3/00, A61P3/04, A61P3/06, A61P3/08, A61K31/717 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/717 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORBEUGUNG ODER BEHANDLUNG DES STOFFWECHSELSYNDROMS | [2009/31] | English: | METHOD OF PREVENTING OR TREATING METABOLIC SYNDROME | [2009/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE PRÉVENIR OU DE TRAITER LE SYNDROME MÉTABOLIQUE | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 22.01.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5576306 (DRESSMAN JENNIFER B [FR], et al) [X] 1-38 * column 10, lines 16-23 * * claim - *; | [X]WO9707689 (MOSS CLIVE B [CA]) [X] 1-38 * page 4, paragraph 3 * * examples 3,6 * * claim - *; | [X]US5721221 (GALLAHER DANIEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * column 2, lines 43-50 * * claim - *; | [X]DE10160409 (BEISEL GUENTHER [DE]) [X] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03053469 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]) [X] 1-38 * claim - *; | [A]US2003206981 (LEE SHIN-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005021038 (BEISEL GUENTHER [DE]) [X] 1-38 * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 12 * * claim - *; | [X] - PANCHENKO V M ET AL, "[Food additive (bifeinol, detovit, squalenol) in the treatment of patients with metabolic syndrome]", KLINICHESKAIA MEDITSINA 2004, vol. 82, no. 7, ISSN 0023-2149, (2004), pages 59 - 61, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/15449778?dopt=Abstract, (20080315), XP002473553 [X] 1-38 * abstract * | [A] - KENNEY J J, "Effect of low-fat high-fiber diet and exercise program on hypertension and Metabolic Syndrome", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HYPERTENSION, ELSEVIER, (200505), vol. 18, no. 5, ISSN 0895-7061, page A198, XP004896174 [A] 1-38 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjhyper.2005.03.543 | [AD] - GRUNDY SCOTT M ET AL, "Definition of metabolic syndrome: Report of the National Heart, Lung, and Blood Institute/American Heart Association conference on scientific issues related to definition.", CIRCULATION, (20040127), vol. 109, no. 3, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 433 - 438, XP002473554 [AD] 1-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000111245.75752.C6 |