EP2087013 - CATALYTIC EPOXIDATION AND HYDROXYLATION OF OLEFIN/DIENE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-2101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATIL, Abhimanyu, Onkar 12 Evergreen Court Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Denness, James Edward, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Denness, James Edward, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/33] | Gerstberger, Gisela, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 07854282.6 | 22.10.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US82100 | Priority number, date | US20060606738 | 30.11.2006 Original published format: US 606738 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008067077 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2087013 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/08, C08C19/06 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
C08C19/06 (EP,US);
C08F8/08 (EP,US);
C08F2800/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/08, C08F210/02 (EP,US);
C08F8/08, C08F210/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHE EPOXIDIERUNG UND HYDROXYLIERUNG VON OLEFIN/DIEN-COPOLYMEREN | [2009/33] | English: | CATALYTIC EPOXIDATION AND HYDROXYLATION OF OLEFIN/DIENE COPOLYMERS | [2009/33] | French: | ÉPOXYDATION ET HYDROXYLATION DE COPOLYMÈRES OLÉFINIQUES/DIÉNIQUES | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]JP2001031716 ; | [DY]EP0380085 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DY] 13-25 * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 35 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 22 * * page 6, line 18 - line 33; claims 1-11 * | [DY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 24, Database accession no. 2001-229934, XP002426711 & JP2001031716 A 20010206 (MARUZEN PETROCHEM. CO., LTD.) [DY] 1-25 * column A * | [Y] - GREGORIO J R ET AL, "Pre-determination of the epoxidation degree of polydienes using methyltrioxorhenium-CH2Cl2/H2O2 biphasic catalytic system", REACTIVE & FUNCTIONAL POLYMERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL, (200508), vol. 64, no. 2, ISSN 1381-5148, pages 83 - 91, XP004996581 [Y] 1-25 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [02.3] * * paragraph [2.4.3]; figure 3 * * paragraph [03.3] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.reactfunctpolym.2005.05.001 | [Y] - VAN VLIET M. C. A. ET AL., "Methyltrioxorhenium-catalyst epoxidation of alkenes in trifluoroethanol", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (1999), XP002477875 [Y] 13-25 * page 821, column 1, paragraph 2 * | Examination | EP1707579 | by applicant | US6627714 | WO2004046214 | US5155247 |