EP2091579 - ANTIMICROBIAL CONTACT LENSES WITH REDUCED HAZE AND PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway, Suite 100 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAREZ-CARRIGAN, Nayiby 1628 Redstone Court St. Augustine, FL 32092 / US | 02 /
RATHORE, Osman 7743 Watermark Lane Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/35] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07854466.5 | 29.10.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007US82776 | Priority number, date | US20060863709P | 31.10.2006 Original published format: US 863709 P | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008055087 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2091579 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L12/08, G02B1/04, A61L27/54, A61L101/06 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
A61L12/088 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/12 (EP,KR,US);
G02B1/043 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2300/104 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2300/106 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE KONTAKTLINSEN MIT REDUZIERTER TRÜBUNG UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [2009/35] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL CONTACT LENSES WITH REDUCED HAZE AND PREPARATION THEREOF | [2009/35] | French: | LENTILLES DE CONTACT ANTIMICROBIENNES À VOILE RÉDUIT ET LEUR PRÉPARATION | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004047879 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 2, line 29 - page 5, line 13 * * page 10, line 25 - page 12, line 11 * * page 13, line 2 - line 9 * * page 14, line 9 - line 16; example 32; claims 36,37,42,44 *; | [X]WO2006012000 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 1, line 26 - page 3, line 12 * * page 11, line 1 - line 25; examples 2-13 *; | [X]US2003095230 (NEELY FRANK L [US], et al) [X] 11-16 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0050]; claims 1,19 *; | [A]DE10024363 (WOEHLK CONTACT LINSEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0017] - [0019]; examples 1-4 *; | [A]WO2004047878 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]) [A] 1-16 * examples 26-29 *; | [A]WO2005065731 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |