EP2079823 - MULTICOMPONENT LUBRICANT COMPOSITION FOR PROCESSING RIGID VINYL CHLORIDE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIM, Francis 1144 N. 19th Street Allentown, Pennsylvania 18104 / US | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Stewart, Lucy Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/30] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07854473.1 | 29.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007US82785 | Priority number, date | US20060589486 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: US 589486 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008055091 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2079823 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, B29C47/94, C08J5/00, C10M177/00, C10N10/02, C10N10/08, C10N20/04, C10N40/00 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
C10M177/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/95 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L27/06 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C10M169/044 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08L23/30 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C10M2205/12 (EP,US);
C10M2205/14 (EP,US);
C10M2205/16 (EP,US);
C10M2205/17 (EP,US);
C10M2207/021 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L27/06, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C10M2205/12, C10N2020/01, C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10M2205/14, C10N2060/04 (EP,US);
C10M2207/1253, C10N2010/04 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | MEHRKOMPONENTIGE SCHMIERSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE VERARBEITUNG VON STEIFEN VINYLCHLORIDPOLYMEREN | [2009/30] | English: | MULTICOMPONENT LUBRICANT COMPOSITION FOR PROCESSING RIGID VINYL CHLORIDE POLYMERS | [2009/30] | French: | COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE MULTICOMPOSANTS PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LES POLYMÈRES DE CHLORURE DE VINYLE RIGIDES | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 21.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0277831 (THIOKOL MORTON INC [US]) [X] 1-22 * page 3, line 10 - line 65 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1086988 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0032] * * example -; claim -; table 1 *; | [X]US2004259984 (GIBSON BRIAN L [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0067] * * examples vi,viii; claim - *; | [X]WO2005090469 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 28, line 18 - page 34, line 12 * * claim - *; | [A]US2006107866 (YANG HU [US], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document * |