EP2117730 - METHODS FOR COATING A METAL SUBSTRATE AND RELATED COATED SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCMURDIE, Neil D. 443 Cherokee Drive Butler, Pennsylvania 16001 / US | 02 /
MCMILLEN, Mark W. 447 Fisher Road Cabot, Pennsylvania 16023 / US | 03 /
RAKIEWICZ, Edward F. 1193 Woodhill Drive Gibsonia, Pennsylvania 15044 / US | 04 /
MILES, Michelle S. 725 Latonka Drive Mercer, Pennsylvania 16137 / US | 05 /
KARABIN, Richard F. 107 Karabin Lane Ruffs Dale, Pennsylvania 15679 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2013/10] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 07855036.5 | 10.12.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007US86935 | Priority number, date | US20060610073 | 13.12.2006 Original published format: US 610073 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008076684 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117730 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117730 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2117730 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/16, C09D5/08, C25D13/02, C23C22/34, C09D5/44, C25D13/04, C25D15/02, C25D13/20 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
B05D7/16 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/08 (KR);
C09D5/084 (EP,US);
C09D5/44 (KR);
C09D5/4492 (EP,US);
C23C22/34 (EP,US);
C25D13/02 (EP,US);
C25D13/04 (EP,US);
C25D13/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | B05D7/16, C09D5/08, C09D5/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN EINES METALLSUBSTRATS UND VERWANDTE BESCHICHTETE SUBSTRATE | [2009/47] | English: | METHODS FOR COATING A METAL SUBSTRATE AND RELATED COATED SUBSTRATES | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À REVÊTIR UN SUBSTRAT MÉTALLIQUE ET SUBSTRATS REVÊTUS ASSOCIÉS | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 57 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/03] | 08.08.1916 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.01.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.07.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.06.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/51] | 16.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.08.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.03.2013 | CY | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | LT | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | MT | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | FI | 10.12.2013 | IE | 10.12.2013 | LU | 10.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2017/37] |
Former [2017/04] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.12.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IT | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.12.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.12.2013 | ||
IE | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.12.2013 | ||
LU | 10.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0064991 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0146495 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0064991 |