EP2114123 - GENERATION OF PLANTS WITH ALTERED OIL, PROTEIN, OR FIBER CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agrinomics LLC 16160 S.W. Upper Boones Ferry Road Portland, OR 97224 / US | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, John P. 4617 S.E. Madison Street Portland, OR 97215 / US | 02 /
NG, Hein Tsoeng Medard 3038 Amberfield Trail Charlottesville, VA 22911 / US | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | King, Hilary Mary, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07855141.3 | 13.12.2007 | [2009/46] | WO2007US87453 | Priority number, date | US20060870357P | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 870357 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008076836 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2114123 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01H1/00, C12N15/82 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
A23K50/75 (EP,US);
A23K10/30 (EP,US);
A23K20/147 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23K20/163 (EP,US);
A23K50/10 (EP,US);
A23L25/30 (EP,US);
A23L33/185 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | ERZEUGUNG VON PFLANZEN MIT VERÄNDERTEM ÖL-, PROTEIN- ODER FASERGEHALT | [2009/46] | English: | GENERATION OF PLANTS WITH ALTERED OIL, PROTEIN, OR FIBER CONTENT | [2009/46] | French: | PRODUCTION DE PLANTES A TENEUR MODIFIEE EN HUILE, EN PROTEINES OU EN FIBRES | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 09.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 12.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1033405 (CERES INC [US]) [X] 1-9,11,12,15 * SEQ ID NO: 61294 * * SEQID61294, SEQI 61296 *; | [X]US2006048240 (ALEXANDROV NICKOLAI [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,15 * abstract *; | [A]WO02072775 (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006007432 (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004092367 (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2008034648 (METANOMICS GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1-9,11,12,15 * SEQID 45132, SEQID 60261 * | [I] - Wrobel, R.L., et al., "A. thaliana At1g58725 mRNA sequence", EMBL, (20040904), Database accession no. BT015533, URL: www.ebi.co.uk, XP002588405 [I] 1-9,11,12,15 * abstract * | [ ] - "RecName: Full=GDSL esterase/lipase At1g58725; EC=3.1.1.-; AltName: Full=Extracellular lipase At1g58725; Flags: Precursor;", UniProt, (20090324), Database accession no. Q3ECM4, URL: EBI [ ] * abstract * | [A] - ZHAO JIANYI ET AL, "Oil content in a European x Chinese rapeseed population: QTL with additive and epistatic effects and their genotype-environment interactions", CROP SCIENCE, (200501), vol. 45, no. 1, ISSN 0011-183X, pages 51 - 59, XP002588406 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - JIANYI ZHAO ET AL, "Conditional QTL mapping of oil content in rapeseed with respect to protein content and traits related to plant development and grain yield", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PLANT BREEDING RESEARCH, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S00122-006-0267-5, (20060414), vol. 113, no. 1, ISSN 1432-2242, pages 33 - 38, XP019417682 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-006-0267-5 | International search | [X]US2006150283 (ALEXANDROV NICKOLAI [US], et al); | [X]US2006277630 (LIGHTNER JONATHAN [US], et al) | by applicant | - BATEMAN A ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 260 - 262 | - MULDER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2003), vol. 31, pages 315 - 318 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HUYNEN MA; BORK P, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1998), vol. 95, pages 5849 - 5856 | - HUYNEN MA ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 10, pages 1204 - 1210 |