EP2110384 - HEPATOPOIETIN AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institute of Radiation Medicine, Academy of Military Medical Sciences Pla 27 Taiping Road Beijing 100850 / CN | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Zuze No.27, Taiping Road Beijing 100850 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Bingxing No.27, Taiping Road Beijing 100850 / CN | 03 /
CUI, Chunping No.27, Taiping Road Beijing 100850 / CN | 04 /
DU, Shaojun No.27, Taiping Road Beijing 100850 / CN | 05 /
WU, Danli No.27, Taiping Road Beijing 100850 / CN | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/43] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07855737.8 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/43] | WO2007CN03722 | Priority number, date | CN200610156298 | 26.12.2006 Original published format: CN200610156298 | [2009/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008077311 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110384 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110384 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/475, C12N15/12, A61K38/18, A61K31/7088, A61K48/00, A61P1/16, A61P35/00 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
C07K14/4753 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HEPATOPOIETIN UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2009/43] | English: | HEPATOPOIETIN AND USE THEREOF | [2009/43] | French: | HEPATOPOIETINE ET SON UTILISATION | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2009 | Translation filed | 23.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 23.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 23.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2007 | AT | 06.07.2016 | BE | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | IT | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | IE | 21.12.2016 | LU | 21.12.2016 | MT | 21.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.12.2007 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.12.2007 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY] - "SubName: Full=Hepatopoietin PCn127; GEDDD", UniProt, (20060711), Database accession no. Q1AHP8, URL: EBI, XP002598225 [I] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5 | [IY] - "Homo sapiens hepatopoietin PCn127 mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20060607), Database accession no. DQ083510, URL: EBI, XP002598226 [I] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5 | [Y] - GATZIDOU ELISAVET ET AL, Insights on augmenter of liver regeneration cloning and function., WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY : WJG 21 AUG 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16937489, VOL. 12, NR. 31, PAGE(S) 4951 - 4958, (20060821), ISSN 1007-9327, XP002598227 [Y] 3-5 * the whole document * | [T] - CUI CHUN-PING ET AL, Isolation and functional identification of a novel human hepatic growth factor: hepatopoietin Cn., HEPATOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD.) MAR 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18306214, VOL. 47, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 986 - 995, (200803), ISSN 1527-3350, XP002598228 [T] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/HEP.22126 | International search | [XP]CN1896100 (RADIOCTIVE AND RADIANT MEDICAL [CN]) | [X] - CUI C.P. ET AL., GENBANK, (20060607), Database accession no. (AAZ31261), XP008111110 | [X] - CUI C.P. ET AL., GENBANK, (20060607), Database accession no. (DQ083510), XP008111109 | [X] - CHEN T.H. ET AL., "Structure of pp32, an Acidic Nuclear Protein Which Inhibits Oncogene-induced Formation of Transformed Foci", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, (199612), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 2045 - 2056, XP000916325 | [Y] - DU S.J. ET AL., "Progress in Research on the Family of Leucine-Rich Acidic Nuclear Protein", BULL. ACAD. MIL. MED. SCI., (200608), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 369 - 372, XP008125285 | by applicant | US5440022 | US5550037 | - BLOMQUIST K ET AL., "Growth stimulation in the liver and tumour development following intraperitoneal injections of liver homogenates in the rat.", ACTA PATHOL MICROBIOL SCAND, (1957), vol. 121, pages 375 - 382 | - LABRECQUE DR; PESCH LA., "Preparation and partial characterization of hepatic regeneration stimulator substance from rat liver", J PHYSIOL, (1975), vol. 248, no. 3, pages 273 - 284 | - HAGIYA M; FRANCAVILLA A; POLIMENO L ET AL., "Cloning and sequence analysis of the rat augmentor of liver regeneration(ALR)gene: expression of biologically active recombinant ALR and demonstration of tissue distribution", PNAS, (1995), vol. 92, no. 7, pages 3076 - 3080 | - MATSUOKA K; TAOKA M; SATOZAWA N ET AL., "A nuclear factor containing the leucine-rich repeats expressed in murine cerebellar neuron", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, no. 21, pages 9670 - 9674 | - MALEK SN; KATUMULUWA AI; PASTERNACK GR, "Identification and preliminary characterization of two related proliferation-associated nuclear phosphoproteins", J. BIOL. CHEM, (1990), vol. 265, no. 22, pages 13400 - 13409, XP002299272 | - BRODY JR; KADKOL SS; MAHMOUD MA ET AL., "Identification of sequences required for inhibition of oncogene-mediated transformation by pp32", J BIOL CHEM, (1999), vol. 274, no. 29, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.274.29.20053, pages 20053 - 20055, XP002303700 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.29.20053 | - CHEN TH; BRODY JR; ROMANTSEV FE ET AL., "Structure of pp32, an acidic nuclear protein which inhibits oncogene-induced formation of transformed foci", MOL BIOL CELL, (1996), vol. 7, no. 12, pages 2045 - 2056 | - LI M; MAKKINJE A; DAMUNI Z., "Molecular identification of I1PP2A, a novel potent heat-stable inhibitor protein of protein phosphatase 2A", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 35, no. 22, doi:doi:10.1021/bi960581y, pages 6998 - 7002, XP002929316 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi960581y | - BRENNAN CM; GALLOUZI IE; STEITZ JA., "Protein ligands to HuR modulate its interaction with target mRNAs in vivo", J CELL BIOL, (2000), vol. 151, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.151.1.1, pages 1 - 14, XP002230286 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.151.1.1 | - SEO SB; MCNAMARA P; HEO S ET AL., "Regulation of histone acetylation and transcription by INHAT, a human cellular complex containing the set oncoprotein", CELL, (2001), vol. 104, no. 1, pages 119 - 130 | - OPAL P; GARCIA JJ; MCCALL AE ET AL., "Generation and Characterization of LANP/pp32 Null Mice", MOLE CELL BIOL, vol. 24, no. 8, pages 3140 - 9 |