EP2139157 - MULTICAST CONTROL METHOD IN ETHERNET PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzen City Guangdong Province 518057 / CN | [2013/32] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Tao ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Yunpeng ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Deqiang ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2013/34] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
ZENG, Tao ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
02 /
XIE, Yunpeng ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
03 /
WANG, Deqiang ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Zerbi, Guido Maria, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Gray, John James Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Gray, John James Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07855755.0 | 24.12.2007 | [2010/01] | WO2007CN03745 | Priority number, date | CN2007191037 | 05.04.2007 Original published format: CN200710091037 | [2010/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008122173 | Date: | 16.10.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139157 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139157 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, // H04L12/28 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
H04L12/18 (EP,US);
H04L12/2885 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | H04L12/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | MULTICAST-STEUERVERFAHREN IN EINEM PASSIVEN OPTISCHEN ETHERNET-NETZ | [2013/10] | English: | MULTICAST CONTROL METHOD IN ETHERNET PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK | [2010/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MULTIDIFFUSION DANS UN RÉSEAU OPTIQUE PASSIF ETHERNET | [2010/01] |
Former [2010/01] | MULTICAST-STEUERVERFAHREN IN EINEM PASSIVEN OPTISCHEN ETHERNET-NETZWERK | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2009 | Translation filed | 03.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 17.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2011 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 18.01.2012 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.2014
28.05.2014
ADMISSIBLE Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN Opponent's representative Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.05.2014
28.05.2014
ADMISSIBLE Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN Opponent's representative Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | 26.06.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.01.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.12.2007 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BE | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | IE | 24.12.2013 | LU | 24.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 24.12.2007 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
PT | 23.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006176835 (JANG SOON-HO [KR], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph 28 - page 3, paragraph 50; figures 2-5 *; | [I]CN1744570 (GUANGDONG PROV TELECOMM CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *; | CN1744570K [ ] (GUANGDONG PROV TELECOMM CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * the whole document *; | [A]EP1670280 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, paragraph 14 - page 6, paragraph 34; figures 1-6 *; | [A] - MIN ZHU ET AL, "A Novel Implementation of VLAN-Based Multicast Carried on LLID in EPON", 2006 ASIAN OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION & OPTOELECTRONIC EXPOSITION & CONFERENCE : 24 - 27 OCTOBER 2006, SHANGHAI, CHINA, PISCATAWAY, NJ : IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, (20061001), ISBN 978-0-9789217-0-5, pages 1 - 4, XP031047183 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - LIMING WEI NAIMING SHEN TOM MEEHAN REDBACK NETWORKS, "Remote Multicast Replication (RMR) Protocol; draft-wei-rmr-01.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20031201), no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015036707 [A] 1-9 * page 2, paragraph 1. Introduction - page 9, paragraphs 4.3 User ID sub-TLV; figure 1 * | [IPA] - CHUANHAO ZHANG, DEMING LIU, LI ZHANG GUANGSHENG WU, "Design of Controllable Multicast for IPTV over EPON", SPIE, PO BOX 10 BELLINGHAM WA 98227-0010 USA ORD - 0000-00-00, Network Architectures, Management, and Applications V, (20071119), vol. 6781, 67841V, doi:10.1117/12.743658, ISSN 0277-786X, XP040248766 [IP] 1,9 * the whole document * [A] 2-8 | International search | [XA]CN1744570 (GUANGDONG PROV TELECOMM CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1, 7-9 * see abstract, description page 6 lines 21-page 8 lines 5 * [A] 2-6; | [A]US2005135365 (SUNG JUNG S [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * see the whole document *; | [A]US2006176835 (JANG SOON-HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * see the whole document *; | [PX]CN101051923 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [PX] 1-9 * see the whole document * | by applicant | US2006176835 | CN1744570 | - MIN ZHU ET AL., "A Novel Implementation of VLAN-Based Multicast Carried on LLID in EPON", IEEE SERVICE CENTER, (20061001), pages 1 - 4 |