EP2209287 - UNIFORM SERVICE ACCESS SYSTEM AND ACCESS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Jianjun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LUO, Shengbo ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
JIE, Fang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Sanping ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/20] |
Former [2010/29] | 01 /
YANG, Jianjun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
02 /
LUO, Shengbo ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
03 /
JIE, Fang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Sanping ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Rapisardi, Mariacristina, et al Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l. Via Serbelloni, 12 20122 Milano / IT | [2011/40] |
Former [2010/29] | Hogeweg, Albertus Johan, et al Zacco Netherlands B.V. Nachtwachtlaan 20 NL-1058 EA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 07855794.9 | 25.12.2007 | [2010/29] | WO2007CN03790 | Priority number, date | CN20071176303 | 24.10.2007 Original published format: CN200710176303 | [2010/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009052673 | Date: | 30.04.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2209287 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2209287 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/10, H04Q3/00 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
H04L65/1096 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0025 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0045 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0054 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | H04L29/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | GLEICHFÖRMIGES DIENSTZUGANGSSYSTEM UND ZUGANGSVERFAHREN | [2010/29] | English: | UNIFORM SERVICE ACCESS SYSTEM AND ACCESS METHOD | [2010/29] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS AU SERVICE UNIFORME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2010 | Translation filed | 21.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 07.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.12.2007 | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | IT | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | GB | 25.12.2014 | IE | 25.12.2014 | LU | 25.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.12.2007 | |
AT | 14.05.2014 | ||
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
GB | 25.12.2014 | ||
IE | 25.12.2014 | ||
LU | 25.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
GB | 25.12.2014 | ||
IE | 25.12.2014 | ||
LU | 25.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
GB | 25.12.2014 | ||
IE | 25.12.2014 | ||
LU | 25.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
GB | 25.12.2014 | ||
IE | 25.12.2014 | ||
LU | 25.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 25.12.2014 | ||
LU | 25.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 25.12.2014 | ||
LU | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006198334 (CIVANLAR SEYHAN [TR], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0074] , [0075] * * figures 3-5 *; | [A]US2007100981 (ADAMCZYK MARIA [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0294] - [0307] *; | [A]US6519266 (MANNING SERGE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 3; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US6519266 (MANNING SERGE [US], et al); | [A]CN1787461 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |