EP2161856 - A METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING MULTI-WIRELESS-SCHEMES IQ DATA BETWEEN A BASIC BAND AND A RADIO FREQUENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Zhiyong ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Feng ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
ZONG, Baiqing ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/41] |
Former [2010/10] | 01 /
ZHAO, Zhiyong ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
02 /
GUO, Feng ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | |||
03 /
ZONG, Baiqing ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Bokinge, Ole Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2012/41] |
Former [2010/10] | Bokinge, Ole Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 07855920.0 | 29.12.2007 | [2010/10] | WO2007CN03920 | Priority number, date | CN20071126190 | 15.06.2007 Original published format: CN200710126190 | [2010/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008151494 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2161856 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2161856 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04L5/00 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L27/362 (EP);
H04L5/0042 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/10] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON MEHRFACH-DRAHTLOS-SCHEMA-IQ-DATEN ZWISCHEN EINEM GRUNDBAND UND EINER HOCHFREQUENZ | [2010/10] | English: | A METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING MULTI-WIRELESS-SCHEMES IQ DATA BETWEEN A BASIC BAND AND A RADIO FREQUENCY | [2010/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES IQ À MULTIPLES SCHÉMAS SANS FIL ENTRE UNE BANDE DE BASE ET UNE FRÉQUENCE RADIO | [2010/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2010 | Translation filed | 14.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 21.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12174254.8 / EP2521286 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2007 | BE | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | DK | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | IT | 10.10.2012 | LT | 10.10.2012 | LV | 10.10.2012 | MT | 10.10.2012 | NL | 10.10.2012 | PL | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | TR | 10.10.2012 | IE | 29.12.2012 | LU | 29.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | ES | 21.01.2013 | IS | 10.02.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
LU | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1742494 (UTSTARCOM TELECOM CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0037] * * claim 1 * * figures 2,3,10 *; | [A]US2002080448 (KIM WOO SIK [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 1-6 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Common Public Radio Interface (CPRI); Interface Specification", no. v3.0, (20061020), pages 1 - 89, CPRI SPECIFICATION V3.0,, URL: http://www.cpri.info/downloads/CPRI_v_3_0_2006-10-20.pdf, (20110411), XP002632189 [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 1 - page 16, line 3 * * page 24, line 1 - page 48, line 16 * * figures 1-23 * | International search | [A]CN1859661 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US6598200 (GREENWOOD JOHN CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al) | by applicant | EP1742494 |