EP2082219 - USE OF A SUBSTRATE FOR THE DETECTION OF CHEMICAL DOPANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/31] | USE OF A SUBSTRATE FOR THE DETECTION OF CHEMICAL WARFARE AGENTS | ||
[2010/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2011/06] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICKHOFF, Martin Kleinlindener Strasse 21 35398 Giessen-Allendorf / DE | 02 /
HELWIG, Andreas Fraunhoferstr. 9 Rgb 80469 München / DE | 03 /
GARRIDO, José Antonio Karlsbaderstr. 18 a 85435 Erding / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Gerhard Sudetenstr. 126 85567 Grafing / DE | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Meel, Thomas Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Meel, Thomas Patentassessor EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung, DSLA IP1 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07856004.2 | 12.11.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007DE02040 | Priority number, date | DE20061053890 | 14.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053890 | [2009/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008058518 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2082219 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2082219 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/12, G01N33/22 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
G01N27/12 (EP,US);
G01N33/0054 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T436/163333 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES SUBSTRATS ZUR DETEKTION CHEMISCHER DOTIERSTOFFE | [2010/40] | English: | USE OF A SUBSTRATE FOR THE DETECTION OF CHEMICAL DOPANTS | [2010/40] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN SUBSTRAT POUR DÉTECTER DES AGENTS DOPANTS | [2010/40] |
Former [2009/31] | VERWENDUNG EINES SUBSTRATS ZUR DETEKTION CHEMISCHER KAMPFSTOFFE | ||
Former [2009/31] | USE OF A SUBSTRATE FOR THE DETECTION OF CHEMICAL WARFARE AGENTS | ||
Former [2009/31] | DÉTECTEUR D'UN AGENT DE COMBAT CHIMIQUE POUR LA DÉTECTION D'AGENTS DE COMBAT CHIMIQUES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION D'UN SUBSTRAT UTILISÉ EN TANT QUE DÉTECTEUR D'AGENT CHIMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.02.2011 | CZ | 09.02.2011 | DK | 09.02.2011 | EE | 09.02.2011 | FI | 09.02.2011 | HU | 09.02.2011 | IE | 09.02.2011 | IS | 09.02.2011 | LT | 09.02.2011 | LV | 09.02.2011 | MT | 09.02.2011 | NL | 09.02.2011 | PL | 09.02.2011 | RO | 09.02.2011 | SE | 09.02.2011 | SI | 09.02.2011 | SK | 09.02.2011 | TR | 09.02.2011 | BG | 09.05.2011 | GR | 10.05.2011 | PT | 09.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
TR | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 09.02.2011 | |
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [PXA] - HELWIG A ET AL, "Gas sensing interactions at hydrogenated diamond surfaces", IEEE SENSORS JOURNAL, (200709), vol. 7, no. 9, ISSN 1530-437X, pages 1349 - 1353, XP011189507 [PX] 14-22 * the whole document * [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSEN.2007.905019 | [XA] - REZEK ET AL, "Intrinsic hydrogen-terminated diamond as ion-sensitive field effect transistor", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, (20060817), vol. 122, no. 2, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 596 - 599, XP005924563 [X] 14-22 * abstract * [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2006.07.004 | [XA] - GI R S ET AL, "POSSIBILITY OF REALIZING A GAS SENSOR USING SURFACE CONDUCTIVE LAYER ON DIAMOND FILMS", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO, JP, (199704), vol. 36, no. 4A, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 2057 - 2060, XP000732319 [X] 14-22 * abstract * [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.36.2057 | [DXA] - TANIELIAN M ET AL, "Effect of adsorbates and insulating layers on the conductance of plasma deposited a-Si:H", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (198001), vol. 35-36, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 575 - 580, XP002477733 [DX] 14-22 * abstract * [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(80)90656-0 | by applicant | - M. TANIELIAN ET AL., "Effect of Adsorbates and Insulating Layers on the Conductance of Plasma Deposited a-Si:H*", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (1980), vol. 35, 36, pages 575 - 580 | - G. MüLLER ET AL., JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (1983), vol. 59, 60, pages 469 - 472 | - R. SUNG GI, "Hall Effect Measurements of Surface Conductive Layer of undoped Diamond Films in N02 and NH3 Atmospheres", JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (1999), vol. 38, pages 3492 - 3496 |