EP2125255 - GUIDING DEVICE FOR THE CHOCKS OF WORK ROLLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILK, Edgar Torstrasse 14 57520 Netphen / DE | 02 /
ZETZSCHE, Heiko Am Höchsten 10 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 03 /
GIESLER, Otmar Fellinghausener Str. 16 57223 Kreuztal / DE | 04 /
BERENDES, Andreas Kreuzbergstrasse 1 57399 Kirchhundem / DE | 05 /
TIEPELMANN, Bernd Schleppbahn 7 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2009/51] | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Meissner, Peter E. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07856037.2 | 27.11.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007DE02144 | Priority number, date | DE20071001322 | 03.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007001322 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008080376 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2125255 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2125255 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B21B31/02 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
B21B31/02 (EP,KR,US);
B21B29/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE EINBAUSTÜCKE VON ARBEITSWALZEN | [2009/49] | English: | GUIDING DEVICE FOR THE CHOCKS OF WORK ROLLS | [2009/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE POUR LES PIÈCES D'INSERTION DE CYLINDRES DE TRAVAIL | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 31.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | HU | 19.10.2011 | IE | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | MT | 19.10.2011 | PL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | LU | 27.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE3906618 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0768125 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, paragraph 9 - paragraph 10; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1260283 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1* column 2, paragraph 9 - column 3, paragraph 19; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO03033183 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 29; figures 1-3 * |