EP2094565 - RAM AIR BASED COOLING AND VENTILATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/36] | RAM AIR BASED COOLING AND VENTILATION SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT | ||
[2010/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHERER, Thomas Tinsdaler Kirchenweg 228A 22559 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Rüdiger Kastanienweg 4 21717 Fredenbeck / DE | 03 /
SOLNTSEV, Alexander Dringsheide 7 22119 Hamburg / DE | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07856666.8 | 12.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007EP10920 | Priority number, date | DE20061060765 | 21.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006060765 | US20060871168P | 21.12.2006 Original published format: US 871168 P | DE20071023685 | 22.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007023685 | US20070939633P | 23.05.2007 Original published format: US 939633 P | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008074433 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2094565 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2094565 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64D13/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
B64D13/00 (EP,US);
Y02T50/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | KÜHL- UND LÜFTUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN AUF STAULUFTBASIS FÜR EIN LUFTFAHRZEUG | [2010/17] | English: | RAM AIR BASED COOLING AND VENTILATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AN AIRCRAFT | [2010/17] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE VENTILATION ET DE REFROIDISSEMENT A AIR DYNAMIQUE POUR AERONEF | [2010/19] |
Former [2009/36] | KÜHL- UND LÜFTUNGSSYSTEM AUF STAULUFTBASIS FÜR EIN LUFTFAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2009/36] | RAM AIR BASED COOLING AND VENTILATION SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT | ||
Former [2009/36] | SYSTÈME DE VENTILATION ET DE REFROIDISSEMENT À AIR DYNAMIQUE POUR AÉRONEF | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 28.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2010 | BE | 06.10.2010 | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | MT | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | PL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | IE | 12.12.2010 | LU | 12.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | HU | 07.04.2011 | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
IT | 12.12.2010 | ||
LU | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
HU | 07.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
IT | 12.12.2010 | ||
LU | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
HU | 07.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
IT | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
HU | 07.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
IT | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
IT | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
IT | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 12.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2001025506 (BUCHHOLZ UWE ALBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 11-13 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] *; | [X]US2005115404 (LEIGH JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1* figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005188716 (BRUTSCHER NORBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 2,4,5,10-13 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0049] *; | [XY]US2006185514 (SCHWALM GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6-9,14-16 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0021] * [Y] 2,4,5,10-13 |