EP2101593 - A PROBIOTIC OAT-BASED FOOD PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Velle RW Ltd. Neocleous House 199 Arch Makarios III Avenue P.O. Box 50613 3608 Limassol / CY | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VYKHODTSEV, Sergey Vladimirovich Velle RW Ltd. Neocleous House 199, Arch Makarious III Ave PO Box 50613 3608 Limasol / CY | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Rogers, Alex Lee Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Rogers, Alex Lee Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07857022.3 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007EP11299 | Priority number, date | RU20060146658 | 25.12.2006 Original published format: RU 2006146658 | RU20060146659 | 25.12.2006 Original published format: RU 2006146659 | GB20070023581 | 30.11.2007 Original published format: GB 0723581 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008077594 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2101593 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/13, A23L1/10, A23L1/105, A23L1/308, C08B37/00 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
C08B37/0024 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A23L7/104 (EP,US);
A23L7/25 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2400/169 (US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/3204, A23V2250/5034, A23V2400/169, A23V2400/321, A23V2400/415 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5034, A23V2200/3204 (US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | PROBIOTISCHES NAHRUNGSMITTEL AUF HAFERBASIS UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2009/39] | English: | A PROBIOTIC OAT-BASED FOOD PRODUCT AND PROCESS FOR MAKING THE SAME | [2009/39] | French: | ALIMENT PROBIOTIQUE À BASE D'AVOINE ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À FABRIQUER CELUI-CI | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 17.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/19] | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXA]WO9117672 (SALOVAARA HANNU [FI], et al) [DX] 35-40 * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 5; example 1 * * page 15; claim - * [A] 1-34,41; | [PXD]WO2007003688 (AVENLY OY [FI], et al) [PXD] 35-40* page 5, line 10 - line 25; example 3 *; | [A] - GUAN XIAO ET AL, "Study on beta -glucan extraction from oat bran and its molecular weight distribution assay", SHIPIN KEXUE - FOOD SCIENCE, BEIJING SHI SHIPIN YANJIUSUO, BEIJING, CN, (2003), vol. 24, no. 7, ISSN 1002-6630, pages 40 - 43, XP009097246 [A] 1-41 * abstract * | [A] - RIMSTEN LENA ET AL, "Determination of beta-glucan molecular weight using SEC with calcofluor detection in cereal extracts.", CEREAL CHEMISTRY, (200307), vol. 80, no. 4, ISSN 0009-0352, pages 485 - 490, XP009097338 [A] 1-41 * table II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/CCHEM.2003.80.4.485 |