EP2100113 - SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR MEASURING A TORQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & CO. OHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASTIAN, Markus Leibnizstrasse 19 55118 Mainz / DE | 02 /
GOLL, Manfred Dudelsheimer Weg 2 63695 Glauburg / DE | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Beck, Jörg Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Beck, Jörg Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 07857299.7 | 07.12.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007EP63532 | Priority number, date | DE20061058060 | 07.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006058060 | DE20071059364 | 07.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007059364 | [2009/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008068334 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2100113 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/10, G01L5/22, B62D6/10 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
B62D6/10 (EP,US);
G01L3/101 (EP,US);
G01L3/104 (EP,US);
G01L5/221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | SENSORANORDNUNG ZUR MESSUNG EINES DREHMOMENTS | [2009/38] | English: | SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR MEASURING A TORQUE | [2009/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION POUR MESURER UN MOMENT D'UNE FORCE | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 24.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005126310 (SUGIMURA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005172732 (FENG SAINAN [US], et al) [Y] 7* paragraphs [0002] , [0059] - [0063] - [0076]; figures 1-3,10,-12,14 *; | [XY]EP1584908 (FAVESS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 7 |