EP2125622 - PIGMENTS CONTAINING TIN AND RARE EARTH ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2017/37] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MRONGA, Norbert Ringstr. 2 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 02 /
BRAMNIK, Kirill Eichelbergstrasse 14 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2017/37] |
Former [2009/49] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07857680.8 | 17.12.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007EP64049 | Priority number, date | EP20070100489 | 12.01.2007 Original published format: EP 07100489 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008083897 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2125622 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2125622 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C09C1/36, C01G23/00 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
C09C1/36 (EP,KR,US);
C01G23/00 (KR);
C01G23/003 (EP,US);
C09C1/00 (KR);
C09C1/0009 (EP,US);
C09C1/0081 (EP,US);
C01P2004/80 (US);
C01P2006/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/65 (EP,US);
C01P2006/66 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | C01G23/00, C09C1/00, C09C1/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TITAN-, ZINK-, ZINN-, SELTENERD-, SOWIE WAHLWEISE ERDALKALI-OXIDE ENTHALTENDE FARBKÖRPER | [2017/14] | English: | PIGMENTS CONTAINING TIN AND RARE EARTH ELEMENTS | [2009/49] | French: | PIGMENTS CONTENANT DES ÉLÉMENTS CÉRAMIQUES ET DES ÉLÉMENTS DES TERRES RARES | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/49] | TITAN-, ZINK-, ZINN-, SELTEREND-, SOWIE WAHLWEISE ERDALKALI-OXIDE ENTHALTENDE FARBKÖRPER | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2007 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MT | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | AT | 17.12.2017 | IE | 17.12.2017 | LU | 17.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 17.12.2007 | |
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
AT | 17.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.12.2007 | |
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
AT | 17.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.12.2007 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
AT | 17.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
AT | 17.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
AT | 17.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IE | 17.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0113229 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [DX] 1-11 * page 7, line 5 - page 8, line 3; claims 8-10; table 3 *; | US4448608 [ ] (JENKINS JOHN W [GB], et al); | [X]EP1690523 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013]; examples 1a,1b * |