EP2100010 - Method for increasing the steam mass flow in a power plant high pressure steam turbine during a starting phase of the power plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/38] | TURBINE BLADE | ||
[2015/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLOS, Stefan Dorstener Str. 31 45657 Recklinghausen / DE | 02 /
HEUE, Matthias Willi-Geldmacher-Str. 140 44879 Bochum / DE | 03 /
PFITZINGER, Ernst-Wilhelm Broicher Waldweg 67 45478 Mülheim An Der Ruhr / DE | 04 /
PIEPER, Norbert Steinstr. 61 47178 Duisburg / DE | [2009/38] | Application number, filing date | 07857858.0 | 19.12.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007EP64237 | Priority number, date | EP20070000140 | 04.01.2007 Original published format: EP 07000140 | [2009/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008080854 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2100010 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2100010 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01K13/02 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
F01K13/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steigerung des Dampfmassenstroms einer Hochdruck-Dampfturbine eines Dampfkraftwerks während einer Hoch-Phase des Dampfkraftwerks | [2015/05] | English: | Method for increasing the steam mass flow in a power plant high pressure steam turbine during a starting phase of the power plant | [2015/05] | French: | Procédé pour accroître le débit de vapeur dans une turbine à vapeur haute pression d'une centrale lors de la mise en route de la centrale | [2015/05] |
Former [2009/38] | TURBINENSCHAUFEL | ||
Former [2009/38] | TURBINE BLADE | ||
Former [2009/38] | AUBE DE TURBINE | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2007 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | MT | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | AT | 19.12.2015 | GB | 19.12.2015 | IE | 19.12.2015 | LU | 19.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/36] | HU | 19.12.2007 | |
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
AT | 19.12.2015 | ||
GB | 19.12.2015 | ||
IE | 19.12.2015 | ||
LU | 19.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
GB | 19.12.2015 | ||
IE | 19.12.2015 | ||
LU | 19.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 19.12.2015 | ||
LU | 19.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 19.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4432960 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]) [A] 1-8* figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]DE10227709 (ALSTOM SWITZERLAND LTD [CH]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0024] , [0025]; figure 1 * |