EP2104486 - USE OF NATURAL DYES FOR DYING HUMAN HAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states L'Oreal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE BONI, Maxime Crest Court Sadohara 413 2-1-4 Ichigaya Sadoharacho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/05] |
Former [2009/40] | 01 /
DE BONI, Maxime Crest Court Sadohara 413 2-1-4 Ichigaya Sadoharacho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | L'Oreal Service D.I.P.I. 9, rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [2021/15] |
Former [2014/05] | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/50] | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2009/40] | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'Oreal - D.I.P.I. River Plaza 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR | Application number, filing date | 07858616.1 | 17.10.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007FR52193 | Priority number, date | FR20060054319 | 17.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0654319 | US20060855756P | 01.11.2006 Original published format: US 855756 P | [2009/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008047055 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104486 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104486 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/05] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2104486 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/35, A61K8/49, A61Q5/06 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
A61K8/49 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/355 (EP,US);
A61K8/4913 (EP,US);
A61K8/494 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/40] | A61K8/49, A61Q5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/15] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG NATÜRLICHER FARBSTOFFE ZUR FÄRBUNG VON MENSCHLICHEM HAAR | [2009/40] | English: | USE OF NATURAL DYES FOR DYING HUMAN HAIR | [2009/40] | French: | UTILISATION DE COLORANTS NATURELS POUR LA COLORATION DES CHEVEUX HUMAINS | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2013 | 09.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.2014
27.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
27.10.2014
30.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Kao Germany GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 98-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2014/49] |
Former [2014/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.2014
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 04.12.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.06.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.01.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.11.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 21.09.2016 | Appeal received No. T2173/16 | 28.11.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.01.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 08.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2020 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2007 | AT | 29.01.2014 | BG | 29.01.2014 | CY | 29.01.2014 | CZ | 29.01.2014 | DK | 29.01.2014 | EE | 29.01.2014 | FI | 29.01.2014 | LT | 29.01.2014 | LV | 29.01.2014 | MC | 29.01.2014 | MT | 29.01.2014 | NL | 29.01.2014 | PL | 29.01.2014 | RO | 29.01.2014 | SE | 29.01.2014 | SI | 29.01.2014 | SK | 29.01.2014 | TR | 29.01.2014 | GR | 30.04.2014 | IS | 29.05.2014 | PT | 29.05.2014 | IE | 17.10.2014 | LU | 17.10.2014 | BE | 31.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.10.2007 | |
AT | 29.01.2014 | ||
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
TR | 29.01.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
GR | 30.04.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
BG | 29.01.2014 | ||
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
IE | 17.10.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
MC | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SI | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
PL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
SK | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
RO | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2014 | ||
DK | 29.01.2014 | ||
EE | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
LV | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
NL | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 29.01.2014 | |
CY | 29.01.2014 | ||
FI | 29.01.2014 | ||
LT | 29.01.2014 | ||
SE | 29.01.2014 | ||
IS | 29.05.2014 | ||
PT | 29.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 29.01.2014 | |
IS | 29.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2543434 (MULLER INTERNATIONAL SARL ALBA [FR]) [X] 1,2,11-13,15-18 * page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 27; examples 1,3-6; claim - * [Y] 3-10,14; | [Y]FR2549721 (SECTA LABO COSMETOLOGIE Y ROCH [FR]) [Y] 3-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 31; claims 1-10 * * page 11, line 10 - page 13, line 25 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 5 *; | [X]FR2787707 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,2,11-18 * page 18, line 5 - page 19, line 31; examples 24,25 *; | KR20050109006 [ ] (KOLMAR CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]EP1127566 (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046]; examples 1,2,4 *; | [Y]EP1454613 (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012]; examples 4,5 *; | [Y]EP1022014 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010]; tables 1,2 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] *; | [X] - CHA, DU HWAN ET AL, "Hair care cosmetic composition having double functions of cleaning and dyeing by containing a natural dye henna", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20060927), Database accession no. 2006:1001982, URL: STN, XP002507683 [X] 1,2,11,12 * abstract * | [A] - STAINSFILE, "Orcein", (20060515), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20060515092427/http://stainsfile.info/StainsFile/dyes/orcein.htm, (20070608), XP002436770 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - "HANSEN SOLUBILITY PARAMETERS OF SOLVENTS", INDUSTRIAL SOLVENTS HANDBOOK, XX, XX, (19960101), pages 35 - 56, XP000944977 [A] 1 * table 4.1 * | by applicant | FR2549721 | US2528378 | US2781354 | - M.R. PORTER, Handbook of Surfactants, BLACKIE & SON, (1991), pages 116 - 178 | Opposition | EP1430876 | US7101581 | JPH10265353 | FR2787707 | US4190064 | GB1096943 | DE10131385 | EP0533937 |