EP2097208 - FRICTION PIECE IN A LUBRICATED MEDIUM, WORKING AT CONTACT PRESSURES HIGHER THAN 200 MPA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.E.F. Rue Benoît Fourneyron Zone Industrielle Sud 42160 Andrézieux-Bouthéon / FR | For all designated states Université Jean-Monnet 34, rue Francis Baulier 42000 Saint Etienne Cedex 2 / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Ecole Centrale de Lyon 36 Avenue Guy de Collongue 69134 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states H.E.F. Rue Benoît Fourneyron Zone Industrielle Sud 42160 Andrézieux-Bouthéon / FR | ||
For all designated states Université Jean-Monnet 34, rue Francis Baulier 42000 Saint Etienne Cedex 2 / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Ecole Centrale de Lyon 36 Avenue Guy de Collongue 69134 Ecully / FR | |||
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states H.E.F. Rue Benoît Fourneyron Zone Industrielle Sud 42160 Andrezieux-Boutheon / FR | ||
For all designated states Université Jean-Monnet 34, rue Francis Baulier 42000 Saint Etienne Cedex 2 / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Ecole Centrale de Lyon 36 Avenue Guy de Collongue 69134 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURIN-PERRIER, Philippe Lieu dit Meizieux 42680 Saint Marcellin En Forez / FR | 02 /
LEDRAPPIER, Florent 18 Boulevard Karl Marx 42100 Saint Etienne / FR | 03 /
MOURIER, Louis Le Bourg 42560 Chenereilles / FR | 04 /
DONNET, Christophe 11 D Cours Fauriel 42100 Saint Etienne / FR | 05 /
AUDOUARD, Eric Le Bourg 43130 Solignac-Sous-Roches / FR | 06 /
MAZUYER, Denis 5 Rue des Gantries 69130 Ecully / FR | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
MAURIN-PERRIER, Philippe Lieu dit Meizieux 42680 Saint Marcellin En Forez / FR | ||
02 /
LEDRAPPIER, Florent 18 Boulevard Karl Marx 42100 Saint Etienne / FR | |||
03 /
MOURIER, Louis 2 Rue Testenoire Lafayatte 42100 Saint Etienne / FR | |||
04 /
DONNET, Christophe 11 D Cours Fauriel 42100 Saint Etienne / FR | |||
05 /
AUDOUARD, Eric Le Bourg 43130 Solignac-Sous-Roches / FR | |||
06 /
MAZUYER, Denis 5 Rue des Gantries 69130 Ecully / FR | Representative(s) | Thivillier, Patrick, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville B.P. 203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Thivillier, Patrick, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville B.P. 203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07858627.8 | 19.10.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007FR52204 | Priority number, date | FR20060054414 | 20.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0654414 | [2009/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008047062 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2097208 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2097208 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/06, B23K26/00, C23C14/06, F01L1/047, F01L1/16, F16C33/10 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
B23K26/355 (EP,US);
B23K26/0622 (KR);
B23K26/0624 (EP,US);
C23C14/06 (KR);
C23C14/0605 (EP,US);
C23C14/5873 (EP,US);
F01L1/16 (EP,KR,US);
F16C33/10 (KR);
F01L1/18 (EP,US);
F01L2820/01 (EP,US);
F16C2220/40 (EP,US);
F16C2223/16 (EP,US);
F16C2223/60 (EP,US);
F16C2240/40 (EP,US);
F16C2240/44 (EP,US);
F16C33/103 (EP,US);
F16C33/14 (EP,US);
F16H53/06 (EP,US);
F16H55/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2107 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | BEI KONTAKTDRUCK VON ÜBER 200 MPA ARBEITENDES REIBUNGSTEIL IN EINER GESCHMIERTEN UMGEBUNG | [2009/37] | English: | FRICTION PIECE IN A LUBRICATED MEDIUM, WORKING AT CONTACT PRESSURES HIGHER THAN 200 MPA | [2009/37] | French: | PIECE DE FROTTEMENT EN MILIEU LUBRIFIE TRAVAILLANT A DES PRESSIONS DE CONTACT SUPERIEURES A 200 MPA | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.09.2012 | DK | 26.09.2012 | EE | 26.09.2012 | FI | 26.09.2012 | LT | 26.09.2012 | LV | 26.09.2012 | MT | 26.09.2012 | SE | 26.09.2012 | IE | 19.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 26.12.2012 | GR | 27.12.2012 | IS | 26.01.2013 | PT | 28.01.2013 | [2019/29] |
Former [2014/25] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 19.10.2012 | ||
TR | 19.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MT | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 19.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 19.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 19.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | EE | 26.09.2012 | |
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 26.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4573690 (DEHART ARNOLD O [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,14,17-19 * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 30 * * column 6, lines 13-39; figures 3,6-11 *; | [X]US4620803 (VEZIRIAN EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9,14,17-19 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 55 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 10; figure - *; | [X]JP2001165167 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1-3,12-14,17-19 * abstract *; | [X]US2002104506 (EDERER ULF GERHARD [AT]) [X] 1-4,14,17-19 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020]; figure - *; | [A]JP2004360011 (LASER GIJUTSU SOGO KENKYUSHO) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [AD]US6886521 (HAMADA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [AD] 1,14* abstract *; | [X]US2005175837 (MASSLER ORLAW [DE], et al) [X] 1-14,17-19 * paragraphs [0009] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016] , [0022] , [0028] , [0029] , [0034] - [0043]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2005217415 (HOFMANN GEORG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,14,15,17-19 * paragraphs [0016] , [0022] - [0026]; figure - * |