EP2126033 - METHOD FOR MAKING BEER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states L'institut Francais Des Boissons De La Brasserie Et De La Malterie (IFBM) 7 Rue Bois de la Champelle 54500 Vandoeuvre Les Nancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states L'institut Francais Des Boissons De La Brasserie Et De La Malterie (IFBM) 7 Rue Bois de la Champelle 54500 Vandoeuvre Les Nancy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IBARRA, Dominique 26 rue de Madrid 91190 Gif Sur Yvette / FR | 02 /
BOIVIN, Patrick IFBM BP 267 54512 Vandoeuvre Les Nancy Cedex / FR | 03 /
MALANDA, Mbaka IFBM BP 267 54512 Vandoeuvre Les Nancy Cedex / FR | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide Direction des Services De la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07858686.4 | 13.11.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007FR52327 | Priority number, date | FR20060054888 | 14.11.2006 Original published format: FR 0654888 | [2009/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059163 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2126033 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12C5/02, C12C7/04, C12C7/14 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
C12C5/002 (EP,US);
C12C5/00 (EP,US);
C12C7/04 (EP,US);
C12C7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BIERHERSTELLUNG | [2009/49] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING BEER | [2009/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE BIERE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1280668 (MOREAU-NERET FRANÇOIS) [A] 1-10 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * claim 1 *; | [A]FR2077044 (BRAUEREI IND AG F) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 11 - line 35 * * page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 2 * * page 11, line 13 - page 12, line 7 *; | [A]DE3912906 (THIEDIG & CO DR [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 3 - line 13 * * column 1, line 46 - line 55 ** column 2, line 53 - line 65 *; | [A]JP2001086963 (ORGANO KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027]; table 1 *; | [A]DE10257835 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] *; | [X] - SPIELBERGER F, "Neue Wege der Sauerstoffentfernung im Brauwasser.", BRAUWELT 1991 GEA FÜLLPACK, HILLE, FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY, (1991), vol. 131, no. 23, page 975, XP009087158 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * |