EP2020923 - IN-SITU MEASUREMENT OF PHYSICAL PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Temperature Concepts Limited Unit 23, Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0EY / GB | [2019/20] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Cambridge Temperature Concepts Limited Unit 23, Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0EY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSHEER, Shamus Hughes Hall Mortimer Road Cambridge CB1 2EW / GB | [2013/18] |
Former [2009/07] | 01 /
HUSHEER, Shamus Hughes Hall Mortimer Road Cambridge CB1 2EW / GB | Representative(s) | Slingsby Partners LLP 1 Kingsway London WC2B 6AN / GB | [2019/20] |
Former [2014/34] | Slingsby Partners LLP 5 Chancery Lane London EC4A 1BL / GB | ||
Former [2014/23] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2013/33] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2013/18] | Slingsby, Philip Roy Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2009/07] | Slingsby, Philip Roy Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07858836.5 | 04.05.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007IB01822 | Priority number, date | GB20060008829 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: GB 0608829 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008035151 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2020923 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2020923 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2020923 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B10/00 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
A61B10/0012 (EP,US);
A61B5/0008 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US);
A61B5/411 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0019 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0214 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,US);
A61B5/7232 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/07] | A61B10/00, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/20] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOR-ORT-MESSUNG PHYSIKALISCHER PARAMETER | [2009/07] | English: | IN-SITU MEASUREMENT OF PHYSICAL PARAMETERS | [2009/07] | French: | MESURE IN SITU DE PARAMÈTRES PHYSIQUES | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 09.02.2009 | Observations by third parties | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2011 | Observations by third parties | 20.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Fertility Focus Limited Warwick Innovation Centre Warwick CV34 6UW / GB Opponent's representative Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE Fertility Focus Limited Warwick Innovation Centre Warwick CV34 6UW / GB Opponent's representative Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | 13.03.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.09.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.10.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.02.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.03.2016 | Appeal received No. T0668/16 | 18.05.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.10.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.05.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2007 | AT | 01.05.2013 | BE | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | MT | 01.05.2013 | NL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | IE | 04.05.2013 | LU | 04.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
MT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
BE | 01.05.2013 | ||
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
PT | 02.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0195207 (FROHN HERMANN JOSEF) [X] 1,5-7,12,15,16,22-26,31-38 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 14; figure 2 * [A] 42; | [A]GB2186977 (BENYTONE CORP) [A] 47* column A *; | [X]US6478748 (KUHN JENS [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-10,12-16,19-38 * column 4, line 23 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003069714 (WIGLEY FREDRICK M [US], et al) [A] 60 * paragraphs [0017] - [0020]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2004152957 (STIVORIC JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,6-38,40-43,48-52 * paragraphs [0069] , [0071] , [0075] , [0076] , [0119] , [0132]; figures 2,18 *; | [Y]US2004171964 (HEITZ KILIAN [CH]) [Y] 47 * column A *; | [Y]US2004242976 (ABREU MARCIO MARC [US]) [Y] 60-69 * paragraph [0340] *; | [XY]DE10345282 (KURT SCHWABE INST FUER MESS UN [DE]) [X] 1-16,18-38,40-46,48-55,58,59 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 47,56,57; | [A]US2005096558 (FRIEDMAN BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 60 * column A; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2005245839 (STIVORIC JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,11-17,19-39 * paragraphs [0106] , [0111] , [0124]; figures 4,19,20 * [Y] 56,57,60-69 | Examination | DE19943456 | by applicant | EP0195207 | EP0476730 | EP0746040 | other | US4509531 | US4549819 | EP0619123 | WO0184518 | US2003210146 | US2004215098 | WO2005032338 | WO2005092177 | DE19943456 | EP1593946 | GB2416633 | US7015826 | US2006070650 | - OLSEN O.A. ET AL, "A data logger tag for the study of slaughter procedures in aquacultured salmon", HYDROBIOLOGIA, (19980101), vol. 371/372, pages 71 - 77, XP019244208 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1017039608765 | - CIARCIA S., "Build a low-power data logger - Computerized data collector runs for years on a battery", CIRCUIT CELLAR INK, (1990), vol. 15, pages S12 - S22, XP003023652 | - "Babycomp and Ladycomp", WWW.LADYCOMP.CO.UK, pages 1 - 2, URL: www.ladycomp.co.uk, XP003023653 | Opposition | US4475158 | KR100682457B | WO2008029130 |