EP2081938 - SUBSTITUTED 8-PIPERIDINYL-2-PYRIDINYL-PYRIMIDO Ý1,2-A PIRIMIDIN-6-ONE AND 8-PIPERIDINYL-2-PYRIMIDI NYL-PYRIMIDOÝ1,2,-A PYRIMIDIN-6-ONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-6-18 Kitahama, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-6-18 Kitahama, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | |||
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-6-18 Kitahama, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | |||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states SANOFI 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-6-18 Kitahama, Chuo-Ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | |||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174 Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-6-18 Kitahama, Chuo-Ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | |||
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174 Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8505 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOCHEAD, Alistair Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
SAADY, Mourad Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 03 /
SLOWINSKI, Franck Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 04 /
YAICHE, Philippe Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Morel-Pécheux, Muriel, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Morel-Pécheux, Muriel, et al Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07859310.0 | 06.11.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007IB04272 | Priority number, date | EP20060291725 | 07.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06291725 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008056266 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2081938 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P25/28, A61P35/00, A61P33/06, A61P37/00 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Extension states | AL | 08.06.2009 | BA | 08.06.2009 | HR | 08.06.2009 | MK | 08.06.2009 | RS | 08.06.2009 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE 8-PIPERIDINYL-2-PYRIDINYL-PYRIMIDO [1,2-A]PIRIMIDIN-6-ON- UND 8-PIPERIDINYL-2-PYRIMIDI NYL-PYRIMIDO[1,2,-A]PYRIMIDIN-6-ON-DERIVATIVE | [2009/31] | English: | SUBSTITUTED 8-PIPERIDINYL-2-PYRIDINYL-PYRIMIDO Ý1,2-A PIRIMIDIN-6-ONE AND 8-PIPERIDINYL-2-PYRIMIDI NYL-PYRIMIDOÝ1,2,-A PYRIMIDIN-6-ONE DERIVATIVES | [2009/31] | French: | 8-PIPÉRIDINYL-2-PYRIDINYLPYRIMIDOÝ1,2-A PIRIMIDIN-6-ONE SUBSTITUÉE ET DÉRIVÉS DE 8-PIPÉRIDINYL-2-PYRIMIDINYLPYRIMIDOÝ1,2-A PYRIMIDIN-6-ONE | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 21.12.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005000800 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 3, formula I * * page 12, lines 25-27 * * page 15, line 7 ** page 16, lines 7,27 *; | [A]EP1557417 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |