EP2095147 - MOTION CORRECTION IN A PET/MRI HYBRID IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARVEY, Paul R. High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/36] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07859376.1 | 13.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007IB55080 | Priority number, date | EP20060126443 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06126443 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008075265 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2095147 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/567, G01R33/565 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
G01R33/56509 (EP,US);
G01R33/481 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSKORREKTUR IN EINEM HYBRIDEN PET/MRI-BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM | [2009/36] | English: | MOTION CORRECTION IN A PET/MRI HYBRID IMAGING SYSTEM | [2009/36] | French: | CORRECTION DE MOUVEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE HYBRIDE TEP/IRM | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.03.2013 | 15.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/35] | 11.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/35] | Appeal following examination | 23.05.2013 | Appeal received No. T1347/13 | 23.05.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.02.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 11.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.02.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005285857 (BONNET STEPHANE [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] - [0065]; figures 1,2 * | [X] - M.SCHWAIGER ET AL., "MR-PET: Combining Function, Anatomy, and More", MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, SPECIAL EDITION, MOLECULAR IMAGING, Siemens medical, (2005), pages 25 - 30, XP002478519 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - B.BENDRIEM, "Recent Innovations in PET and hybrid modality technologies", 9TH SAC SEMINAR ON NEW TRENDS ON POSITRON EMISSION TOMOGRAPHY (PET), St.Petersburg, Russia,, (200609), XP002478520 [X] 1-9 * see overhead transparencies nos. 33-36 * | [X] - FOCAL POINT, "The Fusion Menu Expands - PET/MRI Hybrid Imaging", IMAGING TECHNOLOGY NEWS, SEPTEMBER ISSUE 2006, (200609), URL: http://new.reillycomm.com/imaging/article_print.php?id=183, (20080428), XP002478521 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - LUCAS A J ET AL, "Development of a combined microPET((R))-MR system", TECHNOLOGY IN CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, ADENINE PRESS, SCHENECTADY, NY, US, (20060801), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1533-0346, pages 337 - 341, XP009096801 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [X] - P.K.MARSDEN ET AL., "Simultaneous PET and NMR", THE BRITISH JOURNAL OF RADIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 75, pages S53 - S59, XP002478522 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [DA] - PIPE J G, "Motion correction with PROPELLER MRI: application to head motion and free-breathing cardiac imaging", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (19991101), vol. 42, no. 5, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 963 - 969, XP002207261 [DA] 7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2594(199911)42:5<963::AID-MRM17>3.0.CO;2-L | Examination | US2006266947 | by applicant | US2006266947 | - S. SECHET ET AL., "Frame misalignment-induced errors in PET studies: an investigation on strategies for correction", NUCLEAR SCIENCE: A SYMPOSIUM CONFERENCE RECORD, (200211), vol. 2, pages 1330 - 1334, XP010663765 | - Medical Solutions (Siemens medical, (2005), pages 25 - 30 | - TECHNOL. CANCER RES. AND TREATMENT, (2006), vol. 5, pages 337 - 341 | - THE BRITTISH JOURNAL OF RADIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 75, pages 553 - 559 | - J. DE POORTER, "Noninvasive MRI Thermometry with the proton resonance frequency (PRF) method: In Vivo results in human muscle", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING, (1995), vol. 33, pages 74 - 81, XP000482971 |