EP2099984 - ANCHORING EQUIPMENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR ROOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2012 | Request for conversion to national application | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SI.AL. S.R.L. Via Enrico Fermi 50/A 25030 Brandico (BS) / IT | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANDELLINI, Alberto c/o SI.AL. S.R.L. Enrico Fermi, 50/A 25030 Brandico (bs) / IT | 02 /
MIGLIO, Simone c/o SI.AL. S.R.L. Enrico Fermi, 50/A 25030 Brandico (bs) / IT | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Tirloni, Bartolomeo Bugnion S.p.A. Via Dante, 17 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Tirloni, Bartolomeo Bugnion S.p.A. Via Dante, 17 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 07859425.6 | 18.12.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007IB55197 | Priority number, date | IT2006BS00230 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: IT BS20060230 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008081375 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2099984 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/12, E04G21/32, A62B1/04 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
E04D13/12 (EP,US);
A62B35/0056 (EP,US);
E04G21/3261 (EP,US);
E04G21/3276 (EP,US);
E04G21/329 (EP,US);
E04G21/3295 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | VERANKERUNGSEINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN DACH | [2009/38] | English: | ANCHORING EQUIPMENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR ROOF | [2009/38] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANCRAGE NOTAMMENT DESTINÉ À UN TOIT | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 26.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/02] | 26.11.2012 | Request for conversion into a national application, for IT [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2001025464 (POLDMAA ARVO [AU]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11-15,17,27,28 * paragraphs [0001] , [0039] - [0043] - [0055]; figures 1-4,15 * [Y] 18-22; | [X]GB1531766 (MACBEAN W, et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,12,16,23,27-38 * page 2, line 110 - page 3, line 13; figures 3,6 *; | [X]US2439061 (WILSON SHUR JOHN) [X] 1,16,23 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6668509 (KREBS DALE JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,17 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US1501998 (HANFORD HARRY C, et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4942943 (FLAHERTY BRIAN J [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 21-59; figures 1-3,5 *; | [Y]US2006272891 (CASEBOLT SCOTT C [US]) [Y] 18,20-22 * paragraphs [0038] - [0040]; figures 3,10,11 *; | [Y]FR2857601 (ARGOUD RODOLPHE [FR]) [Y] 18,19 * abstract *; | [A]US5287944 (WOODYARD CLIFFORD P [US]) [A] * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5143171 (GLYNN WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] * figures 1,6 * |