EP2095450 - ELECTRICAL STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMAN, Jan Petrus 15 Lobelia Street 7130 Somerset West / ZA | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07859494.2 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007IB55274 | Priority number, date | ZA20060010805 | 21.12.2006 Original published format: ZA 200610805 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008075317 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2095450 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/02, H01M4/04, H01M4/86, H01M10/12 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
H01M4/02 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M10/128 (EP,US);
H01M4/0433 (EP,US);
H01M4/86 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/24 (KR);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/06 (EP,US);
H01M10/30 (EP,US);
H01M2004/025 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (US);
Y10T29/49115 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2009/36] | English: | ELECTRICAL STORAGE DEVICE | [2009/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/46] | 19.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0243168 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-5,15 * figure 3C *; | [X]US2002122972 (KLITSNER TOM [US], et al) [X] 17 * figures 4,6a,6b,6c *; | [X]DE10313005 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,15* figure 1; claim 3 *; | [PX]WO2007010207 (UNIV NEWCASTLE [GB], et al) [PX] 17 * figure 1 * |