EP2219614 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION OF ORLISTAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventis DDS Pvt Limited 6-3-1239/2 Amar House 4th Floor Raj Bhavan Road Somajiguda Hyderabad 500 082 / IN | [2010/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANDEY, H., C. 2-1-55/2 Venkateswara Colony Uppal Hyderabad 500 039 / IN | 02 /
RADHAKRISHNAN, R., B. 42 Ameerline Bommidi (PO) Pappireddi Patti (TK) Dharmapuri (DT) Tamilnadu 635301 / IN | 03 /
MOHAMMED, Sariha, Farnaaz House no. 1-6-763 Musheerabad Hyderabad 500020 / IN | 04 /
VAGHELA, Dipali F/21 Uday Row House Opp. Vastrapur Rly. Crossing Vejalpur Ahmedabad 380051 / IN | 05 /
LAKSHMI NARAYANA, Reddy Golamaru Plot No. 17, Road No. 3, Tulasi Nagar Pragathi Nagar Road, Opposite to JNTU, Kukatpally Hyderabad 500 072 Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 07859603.8 | 15.10.2007 | [2010/34] | WO2007IN00482 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009050720 | Date: | 23.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2219614 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K31/365, A61K47/10, A61K47/38 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K9/1676 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON ORLISTAT | [2010/34] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION OF ORLISTAT | [2010/34] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE D'ORLISTAT | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 26.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0200201 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 6; example 1; claims 1,7,17-19 *; | [X]EP0638317 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-7 * example D; claims 1-9 *; | [X]WO2006104397 (PROTEMIX CORP LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1-7 * examples 28,29,33-35; claims 11,41 *; | [X]WO02098413 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-7 * page 2, line 8 - line 16; claim 11 *; | [X]US2007191351 (COWEN NEIL M [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0361] , [0364] - [0366]; examples 1,2 *; | [A]WO0209815 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-7 * page 4, line 15 - line 30 * * page 12, line 23 - line 32; claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO9834630 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |