EP2128131 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING VINYLSULFONIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Finechem Co., Ltd. 8-7 Fukumachi 1-chome Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 555-0034 / JP | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIKAZE, Hiroshi c/o Development-Production Center of ASAHI KASEI FINECHEM CO. LTD. 8-7 Fukumachi 1-chome Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 555-0034 / JP | 02 /
MIYAI, Takehiko c/o Nobeoka Plant of ASAHI KASEI FINECHEM CO. LTD. 2741-1, Byumachi Nobeoka-shi Miyazaki 882-0861 / JP | [2015/20] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
AKIKAZE, Hiroshi c/o Development-Production Center of ASAHI KASEI FINECHEM CO. LTD. 8-7 Fukumachi 1-chome Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 555-0034 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAI, Takehiko c/o Nobeoka Plant of ASAHI KASEI FINECHEM CO. LTD. 2741-1, Byumachi Nobeoka-shi Miyazaki 882-0861 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2015/20] |
Former [2011/09] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 07860162.2 | 26.12.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007JP74933 | Priority number, date | JP20060351663 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006351663 | [2009/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008078767 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128131 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128131 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07C303/44, C07C309/20, C07C303/22 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
C07C303/22 (EP,KR,US);
C07C303/44 (EP,KR,US);
C07C309/20 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C303/22, C07C309/20 (EP,US);
C07C303/44, C07C309/20 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/49] | C07C303/44, C07C309/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/20] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VINYLSULFONSÄURE | [2009/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING VINYLSULFONIC ACID | [2009/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À PRODUIRE DE L'ACIDE VINYLSULFONIQUE | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2009 | Translation filed | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 11.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.12.2007 | AT | 13.05.2015 | CY | 13.05.2015 | CZ | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | ES | 13.05.2015 | FI | 13.05.2015 | IT | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | MT | 13.05.2015 | NL | 13.05.2015 | PL | 13.05.2015 | RO | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | TR | 13.05.2015 | BG | 13.08.2015 | GR | 14.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | PT | 14.09.2015 | IE | 26.12.2015 | LU | 26.12.2015 | FR | 31.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.12.2015 | ||
LU | 26.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
IE | 26.12.2015 | ||
LU | 26.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 26.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - DAVID S. BRESLOW ET AL, "The Synthesis and Polymerization of Ethylenesulfonic Acid", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19541220), vol. 76, no. 24, doi:10.1021/ja01653a045, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 6399 - 6401, XP055011437 [X] 1 * page 6400, line 5 - column 1, line 6 * * page 6400, line 36 - column 2, line 52 * [I] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01653a045 | International search | [A]JP2000191629 (KAO CORP); | [A]US3312735 (MEDFORD ROBERT C, et al); | [A]US2619452 (JONES GIFFIN D, et al) | by applicant | US3312735 | US2597696 | - SANGO KUNICHIKA; TAKAO KATAGIRI, JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY SECTION, (1961), vol. 64, no. 5, pages 929 - 932 |