EP2103696 - METHOD OF COOLING HOT FORGED PART, APPARATUS THEREFOR, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HOT FORGED PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASE, Kazukuni c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Hideto c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
TOYOOKA, Takaaki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07860537.5 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007JP75340 | Priority number, date | JP20060356393 | 28.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006356393 | [2009/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008081955 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103696 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/00, B21K1/12, B21K29/00, C21D1/00, B21K1/40, F16C33/64 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
B21K29/00 (EP,KR);
B21K1/12 (EP,KR);
B21K1/40 (EP);
C21D1/00 (KR);
C21D1/667 (EP);
C21D9/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | C21D9/00, B21K1/12, B21K29/00, C21D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABKÜHLEN EINES WARMGESCHMIEDETEN TEILS, VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WARMGESCHMIEDETEN TEILS | [2009/39] | English: | METHOD OF COOLING HOT FORGED PART, APPARATUS THEREFOR, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HOT FORGED PART | [2009/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN ÉLÉMENT FORGÉ À CHAUD, APPAREIL POUR CELUI-CI, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UN ÉLÉMENT FORGÉ À CHAUD | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2009 | Translation filed | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 19.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1911536 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3,6,7 * paragraph [0032]; figure 5 *; | [X]GB2026044 (REED TOOL CO) [X] 2-5 * page 3, lines 100-120; figure 8 * | International search | [A]JP2005232581 (JFE STEEL KK); | [A]JP2005036318 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | [A]JP2005350769 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) | by applicant | JP3100492B | JP2936198B |