EP2165044 - PERFORATION STRATEGY FOR HETEROGENEOUS PROPPANT PLACEMENT IN HYDRALIC FRACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 TG The Hague / NL | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
PRAD Research and Development N.V. De Ruyterkade 62 Willemstad, Curacao / AN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 TG The Hague / NL | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
PRAD Research and Development N.V. De Ruyterkade 62 Willemstad, Curacao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSAREV, Ivan Vitalievich 32/12 ul. Tsiolkovskogo Dolgoprudny 141700 / RU | 02 /
MEDVEDEV, Oleg Olegovich Schorsa str. 127/1-73 Odessa 65036 Odessa 65036 / UA | 03 /
MEDVEDEV, Anatoly Vladimirovich Litovsky bulvar 46-1-209 Moscow 117588 / RU | 04 /
WALTON, Ian 12209 Alexandria Drive Frisco, TX 75035 / US | [2010/23] |
Former [2010/19] | 01 /
KOSAREV, Ivan Vitalievich 32/12 ul. Tsiolkovskogo Dolgoprudny 141700 / RU | ||
02 /
MEDVEDEV, Oleg Olegovich Schorsa str. 127/1-73 Odess Dolgoprudny 65036 / UA | |||
03 /
MEDVEDEV, Anatoly Vladimirovich Litovsky bulvar 46-1-209 Moscow 117588 / RU | |||
04 /
WALTON, Ian 12209 Alexandria Drive Frisco, TX 75035 / US | |||
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
KOSAREV, Ivan Vitalievich 32/12 ul. Tsiolkovskogo Dolgoprudny 141700 / RU | ||
02 /
MEDVEDEV, Oleg Olegovich Schorsa str. 127/1-73 Odess Dolgoprudny 65036 / UA | |||
03 /
MEDVEDEV, Anatoly Vladimirovich Litovsky bulvar 46-1-209 Moscow 117588 / RU | |||
04 /
WALTON, Ian 4131 Midway Road Addison, Dallas, TX 75001 / US | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07861021.9 | 03.07.2007 | [2010/12] | WO2007RU00357 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009005387 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2165044 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 08.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/11, E21B43/267 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
E21B43/267 (EP,US);
E21B43/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | E21B43/11, E21B43/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | PERFORATIONSSTRATEGIE ZUR PLATZIERUNG VON HETEROGENEN STÜTZMITTELN BEI HYDRAULISCHER SPALTENBILDUNG | [2010/12] | English: | PERFORATION STRATEGY FOR HETEROGENEOUS PROPPANT PLACEMENT IN HYDRALIC FRACTURING | [2010/12] | French: | STRATÉGIE DE PERFORATION POUR POSITIONNEMENT D'AGENT DE SOUTÈNEMENT HÉTÉROGÈNE DANS UNE FRACTURATION HYDRAULIQUE | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 20.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3659651 (GRAHAM JOHN W) [A] 4-6 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 36 * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 8 *; | [A]US3888311 (COOKE JR CLAUDE E) [A] 4-6 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, lines 35-48 * * column 3, lines 1-10,39-46 *; | [A]US4665990 (PERLMAN WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, lines 27-33 * * column 3, lines 3-7,30-34 * * column 4, lines 8-43 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 61 *; | [A]US5330005 (CARD ROGER J [US], et al) [A] 4-6* the whole document *; | [A]EP0771935 (BORDEN INC [US]) [A] 4-6 * page 2, lines 26-31 * * page 3, lines 31-36,40-48 * * page 4, lines 1-7,14-20 * * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 13 * * page 9, lines 25-41 *; | [A]WO0049272 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 4-6 * page 2, lines 1-15 * * page 3, lines 1-20 * * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 6 * * page 10, line 17 - page 11, line 28 * * page 15, line 15 - page 16, line 15 *; | [A]EP1267034 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [A] 4-6 * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US2003230408 (ACOCK ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 4-6 * paragraphs [0011] , [0035] *; | [XY]WO2004009956 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0022] , [0033] , [0047] - [0048] - [0050] - [0052] * * claims 10-11 * * figure Fig 4A/B * [Y] 4-6; | [A]US2004224155 (BARRON ANDREW R [US], et al) [A] 4-6 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [0049] - [0050] *; | [A]US2006035790 (OKELL PATRICK R [US], et al) [A] 4-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0021] , [0025] , [0028] , [0060] - [0062] *; | [YA]US2006113078 (NGUYEN PHILIP D [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0010] - [0013] - [0014] - [0017] , [0020] - [0021] - [0027] - [0032] - [0039] , [0041] , [0050] , [0058] - [0059] - [0064] * * figures 1A,2A * [A] 1-3 | International search | [A]US3701383 (RICHARDSON EDWIN A, et al); | [A]SU874997 (LE [SU]); | [A]SU953190 (NAZAROV SULTAN N, et al) | [A] - "Intensifikatsiya dobychi nefti i gaza metodom razryva plasta. Razrabotka i ekspluatatsiya gazovykh i gazokondensatnykh mestorozhdeny", GAZOVAYA PROMYSHLENNOST, OBZORNAYA INFORMATSIYA, VYP. 1, MOSKVA, VNIIOENG, (1987), pages 26 - 27 |