EP2069790 - BINDING SURFACES FOR AFFINITY ASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, CA 92821 / US | [2015/18] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, 92821 CA / US | ||
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 South Kraemer Boulevard Brea, CA 92821 / US | ||
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 N. Harbor Boulevard, Mail Code A-42-C Fullerton, California 92834 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLDO, Joshua C. 1547 Summit Shores Vista Burnsville, Minnesota 55306 / US | 02 /
SACKRISON, James L. 3984 Hunters Hillway Minnetonka, MN 55345 / US | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Baldock, Sharon Claire BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07861621.6 | 01.11.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007US23033 | Priority number, date | US20060863820P | 01.11.2006 Original published format: US 863820 P | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008057366 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2069790 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2069790 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
G01N33/53 (KR);
C40B20/00 (KR);
G01N33/543 (EP,US);
G01N33/54346 (EP,US);
G01N33/54353 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | G01N33/566 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BINDUNGSOBERFLÄCHEN FÜR AFFINITÄTSTESTS | [2009/25] | English: | BINDING SURFACES FOR AFFINITY ASSAYS | [2009/25] | French: | SURFACES DE LIAISON POUR ANALYSES D'AFFINITE | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2007 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MT | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | LU | 01.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/31] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | LT | 29.04.2015 | |
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | LT | 29.04.2015 | |
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19724787 (BIOTEZ BERLIN BUCH GMBH BIOCHE [DE]) [X] 1-32* the whole document *; | [X]US6638728 (DESAI SURBHI [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * examples 1,2 *; | [X]US2004072262 (MONTERO-JULIAN FELIX A [FR], et al) [X] 1-32 * paragraphs [0071] , [0 78] * * paragraphs [0114] - [0117] * * example 2 *; | [X]WO2005010026 (BECKMAN COULTER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-32 * example 1 * * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0102] * | International search | [X]US4480042 (CRAIG ALAN R [US], et al); | [Y]US6821744 (VON DER ELTZ HERBERT [DE], et al) | Examination | US5728588 | EP1650565 | by applicant | US4480042 | US5728588 | DE19724787 | US6638728 | US2004072262 | WO2005010026 | EP1650565 |