EP2091480 - SYSTEM FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEART TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Co-Repair, Inc. 1350 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale CA 94089 / US | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUFER, Michael D. 1259 El Camino Real Suite 211 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
TREBOTICH, Steven H. 35444 Provance Street Newark, CA 94560 / US | 03 /
JACKSON, Jerome 1725 Fallen Leaf Lane Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07861849.3 | 07.11.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007US23560 | Priority number, date | US20060599166 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: US 599166 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008063428 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2091480 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/12, A61N1/28, A61B18/12, // A61B18/14 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00214 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1475 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/35] | A61F7/12, A61N1/28, A61B18/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HERZGEWEBE | [2009/35] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEART TISSUE | [2009/35] | French: | SYSTEME POUR TRAITER UN TISSU CARDIAQUE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 30.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5980563 (TU LILY CHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [IY]US2002049439 (MULIER PETER M J [US], et al) [I] 5-14,16-21 * paragraphs [0009] , [0014] , [0022] , [0039] , [0043]; figure 15 * [Y] 4,15; | [XYI]US2005165391 (MAGUIRE MARK A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,12,13 * paragraphs [0048] , [0 65] , [0204]; figure 6A * [Y] 4,15 [I] 3,4,6-11,14,16-21 | International search | [A]US2005209666 (HUNTER WILLIAM L [CA], et al); | [Y]US2006025838 (LAUFER MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [X]US2006161229 (LAUFER MICHAEL D [US]) | Examination | US2002035361 | US6463332 |