EP2086333 - ISOLATED MYELOID-LIKE CELL POPULATIONS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE 10550 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDLANDER, Martin 1720 Zapo Street Del Mar, California 92014 / US | 02 /
RITTER, Matthew R. 4724 Ventana Way Oceanside, California 92057 / US | 03 /
MORENO, Stacey K. 9146 Lakeview Road Lakeside, California 92040 / US | 04 /
MARCHETTI, Valentina 1440 Reed Avenue San Diego, California 92109 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07862081.2 | 16.11.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US24083 | Priority number, date | US20060600895 | 16.11.2006 Original published format: US 600895 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008063564 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2086333 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/00, C12N5/06, C12N5/08 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
C12N5/0647 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N5/0692 (EP,US);
A61K2035/124 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | ISOLIERTE MYELOID-ÄHNLICHE ZELLPOPULATIONEN UND BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2009/33] | English: | ISOLATED MYELOID-LIKE CELL POPULATIONS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT THEREWITH | [2009/33] | French: | POPULATIONS CELLULAIRES DE TYPE MYÉLOÏDE ISOLÉES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT AVEC CELLES-CI | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006104609 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * examples 3-9 *; | [X] - RITTER M R ET AL, "A single marker identifies a population of mouse bone marrow cells that target retinal vasculature", IOVS, & ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION-FOR-RESEARCH-IN-VISION-AND-OPHTHALM OLOGY; FT LAUDERDALE, FL, USA; MAY 01 -05, 2005, (2005), vol. 46, no. Suppl. S, ISSN 0146-0404, page 3214, XP002566931 [X] 1-2,5-7,12-18 * abstract * | [Y] - OTANI A ET AL, "Bone marrow-derived stem cells target retinal astrocytes and can promote or inhibit retinal angiogenesis", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020901), vol. 8, no. 9, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1004 - 1010, XP002988691 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm744 | [Y] - OTANI ATSUSHI ET AL, "Rescue of retinal degeneration by intravitreally injected adult bone marrow-derived lineage-negative hematopoietic stem cells", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (20040901), vol. 114, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 765 - 774, XP002413476 [Y] 1-18 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI200421686 | [A] - KANSAS G S ET AL, "Expression of the CD11/CD18, leukocyte Adhesion molecule 1, and CD44 adhesion molecules during normal myeloid and erythroid differentiation in humans", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (19901215), vol. 76, no. 12, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2483 - 2482, XP008102675 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [XP] - RITTER MATTHEW R ET AL, "Myeloid progenitors differentiate into microglia and promote vascular repair in a model of ischemic retinopathy", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (200612), vol. 116, no. 12, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 3266 - 3276, XP002566932 [XP] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/jci29683 | International search | [Y]WO2006104609 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al); | [Y] - XUE ET AL., "Metavanadate suppresses desferrioxamine-induced leukemic cell differentiation with reduced hypoxia-inducible factor - 1alpha protein", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (2005), vol. 332, pages 1140 - 1145, XP004929464 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2005.05.066 | [Y] - ZIEGLER ET AL., "AUGMENTED EXPRESSION OF A MYELOID-SPECIFIC PROTEIN TYROSINE KINASE GENE (hck) AFTER MACROPHAGE ACTIVATION", J. EXP. MED., (198811), vol. 168, pages 1801 - 1810, XP008109003 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.168.5.1801 |