EP2095292 - SIGNAL-PROCESSING SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RFID-TAG SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Cable Systems LLC 800 17th Street N.W. P.O. Box 489 Hickory, NC 28601 / US | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWNIE, John D. 9 Knollbrook Lane East Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 02 /
SUTHERLAND, James S. 248 East 4th Street Corning, NY 14830 / US | 03 /
NEDERLOF, Leo Leiweg 66 1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE | 04 /
WAGNER, Richard E. 72 Overbrook Drive Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 05 /
WHITING, Matthew S. 71 Cross Road Lawrenceville, PA 16929 / US | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Sturm, Christoph, et al Quermann Sturm Weilnau Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 D-65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07862916.9 | 13.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007US25597 | Priority number, date | US20060638894 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: US 638894 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008076354 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2095292 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2095292 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR RFID-ETIKETTSIGNALE | [2009/36] | English: | SIGNAL-PROCESSING SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RFID-TAG SIGNALS | [2009/36] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL POUR DES SIGNAUX D'ÉTIQUETTE RFID | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.06.2011 | BE | 29.06.2011 | CY | 29.06.2011 | CZ | 29.06.2011 | DK | 29.06.2011 | EE | 29.06.2011 | FI | 29.06.2011 | HU | 29.06.2011 | IT | 29.06.2011 | LT | 29.06.2011 | LV | 29.06.2011 | MT | 29.06.2011 | NL | 29.06.2011 | PL | 29.06.2011 | RO | 29.06.2011 | SE | 29.06.2011 | SI | 29.06.2011 | SK | 29.06.2011 | TR | 29.06.2011 | BG | 29.09.2011 | GR | 30.09.2011 | IS | 29.10.2011 | PT | 31.10.2011 | GB | 13.12.2011 | IE | 13.12.2011 | LU | 13.12.2011 | ES | 14.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
TR | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.12.2011 | ||
IE | 13.12.2011 | ||
LU | 13.12.2011 | ||
ES | 14.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.12.2011 | ||
IE | 13.12.2011 | ||
LU | 13.12.2011 | ||
ES | 14.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
BG | 29.09.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.12.2011 | ||
IE | 13.12.2011 | ||
LU | 13.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.12.2011 | ||
IE | 13.12.2011 | ||
LU | 13.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.12.2011 | ||
IE | 13.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
MT | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.12.2011 | ||
IE | 13.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.12.2011 | ||
IE | 13.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.12.2011 | ||
IE | 13.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
GB | 13.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
DK | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
IT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
CY | 29.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2011 | ||
EE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
NL | 29.06.2011 | ||
PL | 29.06.2011 | ||
RO | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
SK | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
IS | 29.10.2011 | ||
PT | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
BE | 29.06.2011 | ||
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 29.06.2011 | |
FI | 29.06.2011 | ||
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
LV | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
SI | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | FI | 29.06.2011 | |
LT | 29.06.2011 | ||
SE | 29.06.2011 | ||
GR | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 29.06.2011 | |
SE | 29.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02097710 (GEORGE LEONARD P [AU]) [X] 1,2,4-16,18-23* the whole document * | by applicant | WO02097710 |