EP2102145 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION AND ISOLATION OF THE INDIVIDUAL STEREOISOMERS OF 1-AMINO, 3-SUBSTITUTED PHENYLCYCLOPENTANE CARBOXYLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORDON, Thomas D. 6 Rainbow Drive Medway, MA 01473 / US | 02 /
WALLACE, Grier A. 204 Chace Hill Road Sterling, US 01564 / US | 03 /
HAYES, Martin E. 200 Market Street - Unit 3114 Lowell, MA 01852 / US | 04 /
LUKIN, Kirill A. 158 E. Colonial Drive Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | 05 /
WANG, Lei 53 Canterbury Hill Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 06 /
FERNANDO, Dilinie, P. 600 Meridian Street Ext., Apt. 713 Groton, CT 06340 / US | [2009/47] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
GORDON, Thomas D. 6 Rainbow Drive Medway, MA 01473 / US | ||
02 /
WALLACE, Grier A. 204 Chace Hill Road Sterling, US 01564 / US | |||
03 /
HAYES, Martin E. 200 Market Street - Unit 3114 Lowell, MA 01852 / US | |||
04 /
LUKIN, Kirill A. 158 E. Colonial Drive Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
05 /
WANG, Lei 3 Joseph Reed Lane Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
06 /
FERNANDO, Dilinie, P. 600 Meridian Street Ext., Apt. 713 Groton, CT 06340 / US | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07863231.2 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007US26257 | Priority number, date | US20060876251P | 21.12.2006 Original published format: US 876251 P | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008079380 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102145 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/69, C07C49/697, C07C49/753, C07C227/18, C07C227/24, C07C227/26, C07C227/34, C07C229/48, C07C253/00, C07C253/34, C07C255/46, C07D235/02 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
C07D235/02 (EP,US);
C07C227/18 (EP,US);
C07C227/24 (EP,US);
C07C227/26 (EP,US);
C07C227/34 (EP,US);
C07C253/00 (EP,US);
C07C253/34 (EP,US);
C07C45/69 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C227/18, C07C229/48 (US,EP);
C07C227/24, C07C229/48 (US,EP);
C07C227/26, C07C229/48 (EP,US);
C07C227/34, C07C229/48 (EP,US);
C07C253/00, C07C255/46 (EP,US);
C07C253/34, C07C255/46 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2009/39] | C07C69/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Extension states | BA | 22.06.2009 | HR | 22.06.2009 | MK | 22.06.2009 | RS | 22.06.2009 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND ISOLIERUNG DER EINZELNEN STEREOISOMERE VON 1-AMINO-3-SUBSTITUIERTEN PHENYLCYCLOPENTANCARBOXYLATEN | [2009/39] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION AND ISOLATION OF THE INDIVIDUAL STEREOISOMERS OF 1-AMINO, 3-SUBSTITUTED PHENYLCYCLOPENTANE CARBOXYLATES | [2009/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET D'ISOLEMENT DES STÉRÉOISOMÈRES INDIVIDUELS DE CARBOXYLATES DE PHÉNYLCYCLOPENTANES 1-AMINO, 3-SUBSTITUTÉS | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDP]WO2007089715 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [IDP] 1,3 * figure 1; compounds 4,5 ** pages 25-26, paragraphs [00121],[00122]; compounds 4,5 *; | [IP]WO2007098474 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [IP] 1 * Scheme 3;; figure 3; compound D * * page 28; example 5.1; compound D *; | [E]WO2008079382 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [E] 1-3 * pages 62,63; examples I, J * | International search | [Y]US4841079 (URBAN FRANK J [US]); | [Y]US2005197334 (WANG DEPING [US], et al); | [Y]US2005250798 (DOLLINGS PAUL J [US], et al); | [A]US2006051846 (OHISHI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]WO2006088944 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al); | [Y]US2006246553 (SUZUKI SHUNICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2006264457 (DEVASTHALE PRATIK [US], et al); | [Y] - ASPINALL ET AL., "BINAP: an industrial approach to manufacture", SPECIALITY CHEMICALS MAGAZINE, (200501), pages 34 - 35, XP008111247 | by applicant | WO2006088944 | WO2007089715 |