EP2083906 - VASCULAR ACCESS DEVICES INCLUDING A TEAR-RESISTANT SEPTUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOULTON, William G. 3026 West 7050 South West Jordan, Utah 84084 / US | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/32] | Weber, Thomas Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07863973.9 | 06.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007US83791 | Priority number, date | US20060864540P | 06.11.2006 Original published format: US 864540 P | US20070935100 | 05.11.2007 Original published format: US 935100 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008058136 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2083906 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2083906 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/04 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
A61M39/045 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0036 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0072 (EP,US);
A61M39/26 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49416 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49417 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | GEFÄSSZUGANGSVORRICHTUNG MIT REISSFESTEM SEPTUM | [2009/32] | English: | VASCULAR ACCESS DEVICES INCLUDING A TEAR-RESISTANT SEPTUM | [2009/32] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'ACCÈS VASCULAIRE COMPRENANT UN SEPTUM RÉSISTANT À LA DÉCHIRURE | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 25.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2007 | AT | 02.01.2013 | BE | 02.01.2013 | CY | 02.01.2013 | CZ | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | EE | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | LT | 02.01.2013 | LV | 02.01.2013 | MC | 02.01.2013 | MT | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | PL | 02.01.2013 | RO | 02.01.2013 | SE | 02.01.2013 | SI | 02.01.2013 | SK | 02.01.2013 | TR | 02.01.2013 | BG | 02.04.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | IS | 02.05.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 06.11.2007 | |
AT | 02.01.2013 | ||
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 02.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5114408 (FLEISCHHAKER JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 30 *; | [X]US4895565 (HILLSTEAD RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 54 *; | [X]US2003085373 (DEHDASHTIAN MARK [US]) [X] 1,2,14 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] *; | [A]US6712789 (LANGE MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8 * column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 37; figure 5 *; | [A]US5354275 (BEHNKE BRETT A [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 28 * | International search | [X]US2005256500 (FUJII RYOJI [JP]); | [Y]WO9105581 (BAXTER INT [US]); | [Y]US2006241759 (TRIEU HAI H [US]) | by applicant | US5114408 |