EP2086980 - MACROCYCLIC PEPTIDES AS HEPATITIS C VIRUS INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | ||
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Alan Xiangdong Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 02 /
ZHENG, Barbara Zhizhen Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 03 /
D'ANDREA, Stanley Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 04 /
MEANWELL, Nicholas A. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 05 /
SCOLA, Paul Michael Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07864438.2 | 15.11.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US84788 | Priority number, date | US20060866125P | 16.11.2006 Original published format: US 866125 P | US20070939768 | 14.11.2007 Original published format: US 939768 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008064061 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2086980 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2086980 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/08, C07D487/04, C07D498/04, A61K31/407, A61P31/12 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
C07K5/0812 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/33] | C07D487/04, C07D498/04, A61K31/407, A61P31/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Extension states | HR | 11.05.2009 | Title | German: | MAKROCYCLISCHE PEPTIDE ALS HEPATITIS-C-VIRUS-HEMMER | [2009/33] | English: | MACROCYCLIC PEPTIDES AS HEPATITIS C VIRUS INHIBITORS | [2009/33] | French: | PEPTIDES MACROCYCLIQUES SERVANT D'INHIBITEURS DU VIRUS DE L'HÉPATITE C | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | BE | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | MT | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
BE | 22.12.2010 | ||
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004093798 (ENANTA PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 109 - page 114; examples 1-71; claim - *; | [A]WO2005070955 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 79, line 17 - page 82, line 6; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2005095403 (INTERMUNE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* examples 1.1-3.115,8,9,39; claim -; tables 2,3,5 * | by applicant | US2005070955 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1978), vol. 43, page 2923 |