EP2097865 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING ACCESS TO ASSOCIATED DATA RELATED TO PRIMARY MEDIA DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clark, Christopher M 10200 El Pinar Drive Knoxville, TN 37922 / US | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Pluckrose, Anthony William BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Pluckrose, Anthony William BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07864455.6 | 15.11.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007US84813 | Priority number, date | US20060559922 | 15.11.2006 Original published format: US 559922 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008061184 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2097865 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N21/236 (KR);
G06Q30/06 (KR);
H04N21/2381 (KR);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
H04N21/8126 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN ZUGANG ZU DATEN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT PRIMÄREN MEDIENDATEN | [2009/37] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING ACCESS TO ASSOCIATED DATA RELATED TO PRIMARY MEDIA DATA | [2009/37] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR L'ACCÈS A DES DONNÉES ASSOCIÉES LIÉES A DES DONNÉES MEDIA PRIMAIRES | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 31.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 08.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006026067 (NICHOLAS FRANK C [US], et al) |